EP2402558 - Vanes for directing exhaust to a turbine wheel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2015/51] |
Former [2012/01] | For all designated states Honeywell International, Inc. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mohamed, Ashraf HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | 02 /
Mackenzie, Scott HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | 03 /
Nasir, Shakeel HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | 04 /
Groskreutz, Mark HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | [2012/01] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2016/14] |
Former [2012/01] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11170590.1 | 20.06.2011 | [2012/01] | Priority number, date | US20100823504 | 25.06.2010 Original published format: US 823504 | [2012/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2402558 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2402558 | Date: | 06.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/14, F01D17/16 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
F01D5/141 (EP,US);
F01D17/165 (EP,US);
F05D2220/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/01] | Title | German: | Schaufeln zum Leiten von Abgas zu einem Turbinenrad | [2012/01] | English: | Vanes for directing exhaust to a turbine wheel | [2012/01] | French: | Aubes pour diriger l'échappement vers une roue de turbine | [2012/01] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2011 | Examination requested [2012/01] | 27.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16150023.6 / EP3048253 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.06.2011 | AL | 06.04.2016 | AT | 06.04.2016 | BE | 06.04.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | CY | 06.04.2016 | CZ | 06.04.2016 | DK | 06.04.2016 | EE | 06.04.2016 | ES | 06.04.2016 | FI | 06.04.2016 | HR | 06.04.2016 | IT | 06.04.2016 | LT | 06.04.2016 | LV | 06.04.2016 | MC | 06.04.2016 | MK | 06.04.2016 | NL | 06.04.2016 | PL | 06.04.2016 | RO | 06.04.2016 | RS | 06.04.2016 | SE | 06.04.2016 | SI | 06.04.2016 | SK | 06.04.2016 | SM | 06.04.2016 | TR | 06.04.2016 | IE | 20.06.2016 | LU | 20.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | NO | 06.07.2016 | GR | 07.07.2016 | IS | 06.08.2016 | PT | 08.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 20.06.2011 | |
AT | 06.04.2016 | ||
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
TR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IE | 20.06.2016 | ||
LU | 20.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 20.06.2011 | |
AT | 06.04.2016 | ||
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
TR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IE | 20.06.2016 | ||
LU | 20.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 20.06.2011 | |
AT | 06.04.2016 | ||
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
TR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IE | 20.06.2016 | ||
LU | 20.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 20.06.2011 | |
AT | 06.04.2016 | ||
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
IE | 20.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
IE | 20.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
BE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 06.04.2016 | |
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | LT | 06.04.2016 | |
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 06.04.2016 | |
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | NL | 06.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2010052911 (IHI CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,7-9 * abstract * [Y] 6,9,11 [I] 2-4; | [YA]WO2009086959 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 6 * page 2, line 12 - page 2, line 28; figures 2,3 * [A] 5,14-20; | [Y]US2007140837 (GUEMMER VOLKER [DE]) [Y] 9 * page 1, paragraph 10; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO9519499 (DRESSER RAND CO [US]) [Y] 11 * abstract * |