EP2537918 - Consumer products with lipase comprising coated particles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company IP Department One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2012/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lant, Joseph 18 Netherwitton Way Gosforth Newcastle upon Tyne NE3 5RP / GB | 02 /
Souter, Philip Frank The Nook The Green Longhorsely Morpeth, NE65 8UP / GB | 03 /
Simonsen, Ole Runebergs Alle 3 2860 Soeborg / DK | 04 /
Hansen, Carsten Hoerslev Hasselhaven 2 3500 Vaerloese / DK | 05 /
Erlandsen, Luise Midgaard 3 3600 Frederikssund / DK | [2012/52] | Representative(s) | Peet, Jillian Wendy Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | Peet, Jillian Wendy Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 11170618.0 | 20.06.2011 | [2012/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2537918 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/00, C11D3/39, C11D3/386 | [2012/52] | CPC: |
C11D3/38636 (EP,US);
C11D3/38672 (EP,US);
C11D3/3935 (EP,US);
C11D3/3945 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verbraucherprodukte mit lipasenhaltigen beschichteten Partikeln | [2012/52] | English: | Consumer products with lipase comprising coated particles | [2012/52] | French: | Produits de consommation avec particules enrobées comprenant une lipase | [2012/52] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/47] | 13.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/17] | 19.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2016 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees LV, DE, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 15.10.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 15.10.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.10.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 15.10.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 15.10.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.10.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 15.10.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 15.10.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.10.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2009118329 (NOVOZYMES AS [DK], et al) [I] 1-17 * claim - * * page 13, line 20 - line 23 * * page 5, line 3 - line 10 * * page 6, line 21 - page 7, line 13 * * Examples 2,5,8,9 (Final Coat #2 #3) * | by applicant | WO2009019075 | WO2009118329 | US2001031714 | WO9937746 | WO9723606 | WO9528469 | WO9528468 | WO9528466 | EP0390446 | US4106991 | EP0170360 | EP0304441 | EP0304442 | WO9212645 | WO9716076 | WO9739116 | US4016040 | US4713245 | EP0170360 | EP0304332 | EP0304331 | WO9009440 | WO9009428 | WO8908694 | WO8908695 | WO0001793 | EP0304332 | EP0458849 | EP0458845 | WO8707292 | WO9106638 | WO9213030 | WO9307260 | WO9307263 | WO9638527 | WO9616151 | WO0125412 | WO0220746 | WO0228369 | US5879920 | US5324649 | US4689297 | US6348442 | EP0206417 | EP0193829 | DE4344215 | DE4322229 | DE263790 | JPS61162185 | JPS58179492 | WO9707202 | WO0060063 | WO2006090335 | EP0218272 | EP0331376 | GB1372034 | WO9506720 | WO9627002 | WO9612012 | JPS6474992 | WO9116422 | WO03076580 | WO2009007510 | WO9613580 | WO0034450 | WO0192502 | GB1296839 | WO9402597 | WO9418314 | WO9510603 | WO9526397 | WO9623873 | WO9743424 | WO0060060 | WO0166712 | WO2006002643 | WO8906279 | WO8906270 | WO9425583 | WO9219729 | WO9820115 | WO9820116 | WO9834946 | US4435307 | EP0495257 | WO9629397 | WO9812307 | WO9117243 | WO9407998 | WO9117244 | WO02099091 | WO2004053039 | JP2000210081 | WO9902663 | WO0162903 | US6124127 | WO9927083 | WO9927084 | WO0206442 | WO02092741 | WO03095638 | WO9964619 | WO9817767 | US5360569 | US5360568 | US5576282 | US5817614 | WO2005047264 | US5753599 | US6649085 | US4430243 | US5597936 | US5595967 | US7501389 | US6225464 | WO0032601 | EP1109965 | EP1259522 | EP1240378 | EP1240379 | US6306812 | US6326348 | US7208459 | US2009247449 | US6312936 | US5679630 | US4760025 | US7262042 | WO2009021867 | WO2005052161 | WO2005052146 | WO2007044993 | US5352604 | US7153818 | WO9700324 | EP1022334 | WO9623874 | US5856164 | WO9923211 | US6093562 | US6939702 | US2009217464 | US4990280 | US2003087791 | US2003087790 | US2005003983 | US2004048764 | US4762636 | US6291412 | US2005227891 | EP1070115 | US5879584 | US5691297 | US5574005 | US5569645 | US5565422 | US5516448 | US5489392 | US5486303 | US5869438 | WO2004003188 | WO2007001262 | - C. E. CAPES, Handbook of Powder Technology; Particle size enlargement, ELSEVIER, (1980), vol. 1 | - Powdered detergents; Surfactant Science Series, MARCEL DEKKER, (1998), vol. 7 1, pages 140 - 142 | - Powdered detergents; Surfactant Science Series, MARCEL DEKKER, (1998), vol. 71, pages 140 - 142 | - DARTOIS ET AL., BIOCHEMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (1993), vol. 1131, pages 253 - 360 | - H. KONTKANEN ET AL., APP. ENVIRON. MICROBIOLOGY, (2009), pages 2148 - 2157 | - H. KONTKANEN ET AL., ENZYME MICROB TECHNOL., (2006), vol. 39, pages 265 - 273 | - TETRAHEDRON, (1992), vol. 49, no. 2, pages 423 - 38 | - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1987), vol. 28, no. 48, pages 6061 - 6064 | - THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1990), vol. 55, no. 4, pages 1254 - 61 | - JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, (1994), pages 2569 - 70 | - POLISH JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 77, no. 5, pages 577 - 590 | - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1994), vol. 35, no. 34, pages 6329 - 30 | DK2002PA00473 | WO2009EP56875 | WO2003DK00456 |