EP2399743 - Resin composition for laser engraving, relief printing plate precursor for laser engraving and process for producing same, and process for making relief printing plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30 Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamashita, Katsuhiro c/o Fujifilm Corporation 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | [2011/52] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11170939.0 | 22.06.2011 | [2011/52] | Priority number, date | JP20100145889 | 28.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010145889 | [2011/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2399743 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2399743 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B41C1/05, B41N1/12, G03F7/038, G03F7/075 | [2011/52] | CPC: |
B41C1/05 (EP,US);
B41N1/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Harzzusammensetzung für Lasergravierung, Reliefdruckplattenvorläufer für Lasergravierung und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung der Reliefdruckplatte | [2011/52] | English: | Resin composition for laser engraving, relief printing plate precursor for laser engraving and process for producing same, and process for making relief printing plate | [2011/52] | French: | Composition de résine pour gravure au laser, précurseur de plaque d'impression en relief pour gravure au laser et son procédé de production et procédé de fabrication de la plaque d'impression en relief | [2011/52] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 11.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/49] | 09.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.01.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2168764 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-17 * claims 1-14; table 7; compounds S1-S5 * | by applicant | JP2008163081 | JP4627926B | JPS5147334B | JPS57196231 | JPS595240 | JPS595241 | JPH02226149 | JPH01165613 | JPS5421726B | JPS4841708B | JPS5137193 | JPH0232293B | JPH0216765B | JPS5849860B | JPS5617654B | JPS6239417B | JPS6239418B | JPS63277653 | JPS63260909 | JPH01105238 | JPS4864183 | JPS4943191B | JPS5230490B | JPS4643946B | JPH0140337B | JPH0140336B | JPH0225493 | JPS6122048 | JP2008063554 | JP2009178869 | JP2009172658 | JP2009214334 | - KAGAKU DAI JITEN, Science Dictionary, MARUZEN, page 154 | - JOURNAL OF THE ADHESION SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (1984), vol. 20, no. 7, pages 300 - 308 |