EP2400245 - Drum for drying material webs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miyakoshi Printing Machinery Co., Ltd. 13-5, Tsudanuma 1-chome Narashino-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | [2011/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Izawa, Hideo c/o Miyakoshi Printing Machinery Co., Ltd. 13-5, Tsudanuma 1-chome Narashino-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Namiki, Takao c/o Miyakoshi Printing Machinery Co., Ltd. 13-5, Tsudanuma 1-chome Narashino-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Yamazaki, Yuuichi c/o Miyakoshi Printing Machinery Co., Ltd. 13-5, Tsudanuma 1-chome Narashino-shi Chiba-ken / FR | [2011/52] | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 Bis Esplanade de La Défense CS 60347 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/36] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | ||
Former [2011/52] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam F-75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11171034.9 | 22.06.2011 | [2011/52] | Priority number, date | JP20100145069 | 25.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010145069 | [2011/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2400245 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2400245 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2400245 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F26B13/18 | [2011/52] | CPC: |
F26B13/183 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] |
Former [2011/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Trommel zum Trocknen von Materialbahnen | [2011/52] | English: | Drum for drying material webs | [2011/52] | French: | Tambour de séchage de bandes de matériau | [2011/52] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 01.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2020 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.06.2011 | AL | 02.09.2020 | AT | 02.09.2020 | CY | 02.09.2020 | CZ | 02.09.2020 | DK | 02.09.2020 | EE | 02.09.2020 | ES | 02.09.2020 | FI | 02.09.2020 | HR | 02.09.2020 | LT | 02.09.2020 | LV | 02.09.2020 | MC | 02.09.2020 | MK | 02.09.2020 | MT | 02.09.2020 | PL | 02.09.2020 | RO | 02.09.2020 | RS | 02.09.2020 | SE | 02.09.2020 | SI | 02.09.2020 | SK | 02.09.2020 | SM | 02.09.2020 | TR | 02.09.2020 | BG | 02.12.2020 | NO | 02.12.2020 | GR | 03.12.2020 | IS | 02.01.2021 | PT | 04.01.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 22.06.2011 | |
AL | 02.09.2020 | ||
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CY | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
MK | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
TR | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 22.06.2011 | |
AL | 02.09.2020 | ||
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CY | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
MK | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 22.06.2011 | |
AL | 02.09.2020 | ||
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CY | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CY | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 02.09.2020 | |
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 02.09.2020 | |
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB949484 (ESCHER WYSS GMBH) [X] 1-4,8 * page 1, line 45 - page 2, line 11; figure - *; | [XI]WO0131271 (RESEARCH INC [US]) [X] 1-4,6-9 * page 15, line 11 - page 16, line 14 * * figures 3-5 * [I] 5; | [AD]JP2001141364 (MIYAKOSHI PRINTING MACH) [AD] 1-9* abstract * | by applicant | JP2001141364 | JP2010145069 |