EP2399854 - Diverting device for flat products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/52] | Switching device for flat products | ||
[2014/02] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Palamides GmbH Benzstrasse 14 71272 Renningen / DE | [2011/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mesquita, Cristovao In den Ziegelwiesen 38-1 71229 Leonberg / DE | 02 /
Schweitzer, Martin Hermann-Essig-Str. 75 71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | [2011/52] | Representative(s) | Weller, Wolfgang Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | Weller, Wolfgang Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 11171069.5 | 22.06.2011 | [2011/52] | Priority number, date | DE20101025224 | 23.06.2010 Original published format: DE102010025224 | [2011/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2399854 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2399854 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65H29/40, B65H31/06 | [2011/52] | CPC: |
B65H29/40 (EP,US);
B65H31/06 (EP,US);
B65H2301/42142 (EP,US);
B65H2404/3111 (EP,US);
B65H2404/6591 (EP,US);
B65H2701/1916 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Umlenkvorrichtung für flächige Produkte | [2011/52] | English: | Diverting device for flat products | [2014/02] | French: | Dispositif de déviation pour produits plats | [2011/52] |
Former [2011/52] | Switching device for flat products | Examination procedure | 17.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/31] | 03.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/45] | 17.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.01.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2925271 (FAEBER HARRY W) [X] 1 * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 2; figure - *; | [A]EP0061631 (BARTESAGHI ANGELO) [A] 1,12* page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 14; figure - *; | [X]EP0240691 (GRAPHA HOLDING AG [CH]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-12 * page 3 - page 6; figure - *; | [X]DE4023233 (BREHMER BUCHBINDEREIMASCHINEN [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-12 * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 22; figure - *; | [X]DE4023234 (BREHMER BUCHBINDEREIMASCHINEN [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-12 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 47; figure -; claim - *; | [X]EP0442590 (KLUESSENDORF AG [DE]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 18; figure - * |