EP2372822 - Battery, electrode, and current collector used therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.10.2014 [2014/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ito, Shuji c/o Panasonic Corporation, IPROC IP Development Center 7F Twin OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Kogetsu, Yasutaka c/o Panasonic Corporation, IPROC IP Development Center 7F Twin OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
Iwamoto, Kazuya c/o Panasonic Corporation, IPROC IP Development Center 7F Twin OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
Honda, Kazuyoshi c/o Panasonic Corporation, IPROC IP Development Center 7F Twin OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
Yamamoto, Taisuke c/o Panasonic Corporation, IPROC IP Development Center 7F Twin OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 06 /
Ueyama, Yasuhiro c/o Panasonic Corporation, IPROC IP Development Center 7F Twin OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 07 /
Ohara, Keisuke c/o Panasonic Corporation, IPROC IP Development Center 7F Twin OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 08 /
Katayama, Hitoshi c/o Panasonic Corporation, IPROC IP Development Center 7F Twin OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2011/40] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2011/40] | Application number, filing date | 11171498.6 | 26.12.2007 | [2011/40] | Priority number, date | JP20060352768 | 27.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006352768 | JP20070120768 | 01.05.2007 Original published format: JP 2007120768 | JP20070128460 | 14.05.2007 Original published format: JP 2007128460 | JP20070156012 | 13.06.2007 Original published format: JP 2007156012 | JP20070237715 | 13.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007237715 | JP20070253199 | 28.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007253199 | [2011/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2372822 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2372822 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/70, H01M4/02, H01M4/66, H01M10/0525 | [2011/48] | CPC: |
H01M4/70 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M4/02 (KR);
H01M4/04 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/38 (KR);
H01M4/66 (EP,US);
H01M4/662 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (US);
Y02T10/70 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/40] | H01M4/70, H01M4/02, H01M4/66 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Batterie, Elektrode und dafür verwendeter Stromabnehmer | [2011/40] | English: | Battery, electrode, and current collector used therefor | [2011/40] | French: | Batterie, électrode et collecteur de courant utilisé à ces fins | [2011/40] | Examination procedure | 22.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/26] | 04.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/40] | 26.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/40] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07860119.2 / EP2056381 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070860119) is 25.11.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2005064291 (SATO TOSHITADA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6,8-12 * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0032] , [0035] , [0036] , [0042] , [0043] * * examples 1-59 * * claims 1-14 * [A] 7; | [Y]JP2005196970 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-6,8-12 * abstract * * claims 1,5 * * paragraph [0016] * * figures 2,3 * * example 3 * | by applicant | JP2004127561 | WO0131722 | JP2002313319 | JP2006155958 | EP2056381 | EP20070860119 |