EP2402395 - Curable compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2012/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilson, Mark B. 217 Lexington Clute, TX Texas 77531 / US | 02 /
Larsen, Travis H. 1 Hermann Park Court - Apt. 540 Houston, TX Texas 77021 / US | [2012/01] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11171636.1 | 28.06.2011 | [2012/01] | Priority number, date | US20100359540P | 29.06.2010 Original published format: US 359540 P | [2012/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2402395 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Classification | IPC: | C08L63/00, C09J163/00, C08G59/68, C08K3/10, C08K3/04, H01B1/12, H01R4/04 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
C09J163/00 (EP,US);
H01B1/20 (KR);
C08G59/027 (EP,US);
C08G59/245 (EP,US);
C08G59/504 (EP,US);
H01B1/22 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Härtbare Zusammensetzungen | [2012/01] | English: | Curable compositions | [2012/01] | French: | Compositions durcissables | [2012/01] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2011 | Examination requested [2012/01] | 25.10.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US5929141 | EP1701361 | US7405247 | US7018701 | US5575956 | WO2010077483 | US2924580 |