19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
17.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
06.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
26.05.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] |
12.05.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
04.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
05.08.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
20.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] |
13.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
06.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
22.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
15.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
12.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
05.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
29.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
22.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] |
15.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] |
28.08.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] |
24.08.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
24.08.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.07.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
22.06.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.04.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.04.2015 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
14.04.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.03.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] |
20.03.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] |
25.06.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.09.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.06.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.06.2013 |
First examination report |
|
08.02.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
25.01.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] |
21.01.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.01.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] |