Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8803350 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2014 | B2 | US2013001946 | 03.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11171899 | 29.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102852716B | Global Dossier | 18.07.2017 | B | CN102852716 | 02.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP11171899 | 29.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2541722 | Global Dossier | 30.09.2015 | B1 | EP2541722 | 02.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11171899 | 29.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2541722T | 11.01.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP11171899 | 29.06.2011 |