EP2464109 - Image correction for video phone applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | 01.09.2017 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitel Networks Corporation 350 Legget Drive Ottawa, ON K2K 2W7 / CA | [2012/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Erb, Paul Andrew 358 Wilbrod Street Ottawa, Ontario K1N 6M5 / CA | 02 /
Conner, Michael James 10 Havenwood Trail Stittsville, Ontario K2S 1C9 / CA | [2012/24] | Representative(s) | Derry, Paul Stefan Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2014/05] |
Former [2012/24] | Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 11171961.3 | 29.06.2011 | [2012/24] | Priority number, date | US20100928399 | 10.12.2010 Original published format: US 928399 | [2012/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2464109 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/14, H04N5/232 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
H04N7/144 (EP,US);
H04N23/611 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bildkorrektur für Bildtelefonanwendungen | [2012/24] | English: | Image correction for video phone applications | [2012/24] | French: | Correction d'images pour application de visiophonie | [2012/24] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/04] | 26.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/40] | 25.08.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.09.2017 | 27.09.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.09.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5986703 (O'MAHONY BARRY A [US]) [X] 1,2,8 * column 1, line 21 - line 51 * * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 5 * * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 26 * * column 4, line 53 - column 6, line 6 * * column 6, line 60 - column 7, line 7 * * column 7, line 48 - column 8, line 34 *; | [XYI]WO2004053795 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 8 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 2 * * page 2, line 10 - page 5, line 2 * [Y] 12 [I] 9-11; | [XYI]WO2006003066 (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE], et al) [X] 8 * page 1, line 19 - page 2, line 12 * * page 7, line 16 - page 11, line 16 * [Y] 7 [I] 1-6; | [Y]US7227567 (BECK ALEXANDER JOHN GRAY [AU], et al) [Y] 7,12 * column 1, line 21 - line 55 * * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 23 * * column 4, line 35 - column 5, line 54 * * column 6, line 46 - line 58 ** column 7, line 12 - column 9, line 8 * | by applicant | US2008240517 | - "Efficient Realtime Face Tracking Operator Study and Implementation Within Virtex FPGA Technology", THE INTERNATIONAL ARAB JOURNAL OF INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY, vol. 4, no. 1, (200701), URL: http://www.face-rec.org/ and http://www.ccis2k.org/iajit/PDF/vol.4,no.1/2-Mostefai.pdf | - JOOYOUNG PARK, DAESUNG KANG, JAMES T. KWOK, SANG-WOONG LEE, BON-WOO HWANG, SEONG-WHAN LEE, "Facial Image Reconstruction by SVDD-Based Pattern De-noising", ADVANCES IN BIOMETRICS LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 3832, pages 129 - 135, XP019026866 |