Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2433853 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2017 | B1 | EP2433853 | 07.11.2012 | A3 | EP2433853 | 28.03.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102010046043 | 22.09.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102010046043 | 22.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102010046043 | 22.09.2010 |