EP2403273 - Multi-mode radio for hearing assistance devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Starkey Laboratories, Inc. 6600 Washington Avenue South Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | [2012/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Solum, Jeffrey Paul 4148 Hillcrest Road Deephaven, MN Minnesota 55391 / US | [2012/01] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2012/01] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11172146.0 | 30.06.2011 | [2012/01] | Priority number, date | US20100830290 | 03.07.2010 Original published format: US 830290 | [2012/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2403273 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2403273 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
H04R25/554 (EP,US);
H04B7/26 (EP,US);
H04R2225/51 (EP,US);
H04R25/558 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/01] | Title | German: | Mehrmodus-Funk für Hörhilfevorrichtungen | [2012/01] | English: | Multi-mode radio for hearing assistance devices | [2012/01] | French: | Radio multimodale pour dispositifs d'aide auditive | [2012/01] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/33] | 28.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2011 | AL | 20.08.2014 | AT | 20.08.2014 | BE | 20.08.2014 | CY | 20.08.2014 | CZ | 20.08.2014 | EE | 20.08.2014 | ES | 20.08.2014 | FI | 20.08.2014 | HR | 20.08.2014 | IT | 20.08.2014 | LT | 20.08.2014 | LV | 20.08.2014 | MC | 20.08.2014 | MK | 20.08.2014 | MT | 20.08.2014 | PL | 20.08.2014 | RO | 20.08.2014 | RS | 20.08.2014 | SE | 20.08.2014 | SI | 20.08.2014 | SK | 20.08.2014 | SM | 20.08.2014 | TR | 20.08.2014 | BG | 20.11.2014 | NO | 20.11.2014 | GR | 21.11.2014 | IS | 20.12.2014 | PT | 22.12.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 30.06.2011 | |
AT | 20.08.2014 | ||
BE | 20.08.2014 | ||
CY | 20.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
MK | 20.08.2014 | ||
MT | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
SM | 20.08.2014 | ||
TR | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 30.06.2011 | |
AT | 20.08.2014 | ||
BE | 20.08.2014 | ||
CY | 20.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
MT | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
SM | 20.08.2014 | ||
TR | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
BE | 20.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
MT | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
BE | 20.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | ES | 20.08.2014 | |
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 20.08.2014 | |
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 20.08.2014 | |
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 20.08.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP1942702 (STARKEY LAB INC [US]) [X] 1-3,6-9,11-13,16 * paragraphs [0005] , [0012] - [0015] * [Y] 4 [I] 5; | [XYI]EP2026406 (OTICON AS [DK]) [X] 1-3,6-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0019] , [0024] - [0028] - [0033] - [0035] - [0041] - [0046] * [Y] 4 [I] 5; | [Y]EP2052758 (COCHLEAR LTD [AU], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0028] * * figure 1A *; | [A] - Philips Semiconductors, "TEA5591AAM/FM radio receiver circuit", (19900201), URL: www.datasheetarchive.com/TEA5591A-datasheet.html, (20110912), XP002658699 [A] 5 * page 2 * | by applicant | US2006274747 | WO2006133158 | US7256747 | US7446720 | US7529565 | US7593538 | US20040768735 | US20060357751 | US20070676420 | US20080027151 | US20080340600 | US20080340604 | US20090550821 | US20090638720 | US20090645007 |