EP2380895 - FURANOSE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/43] | Furanose Derivatives | ||
[2012/50] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cbz Chemicals Limited Quayside House King Edward Close Colchester Essex CO2 8JN / GB | [2011/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pradhan, Braja Sundar 122, Feering Hill Feering, Colchester, Essex CO5 9PY / GB | [2012/50] |
Former [2011/43] | 01 /
Pradhan, Braja Sundar c/o: CBZ Chemicals Limited Quayside House King Edward Close Colchester, Essex CO2 8JN / GB | Representative(s) | Strych, Werner Maximilian Josef Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/43] | Strych, Werner Maximilian Josef Hansmann & Vogeser, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11172240.1 | 12.06.2008 | [2011/43] | Priority number, date | GB20070011250 | 12.06.2007 Original published format: GB 0711250 | US20070943357P | 12.06.2007 Original published format: US 943357 P | [2011/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2380895 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07H1/00, C07H9/04, C07D207/34, C07D493/04 | [2011/43] | CPC: |
C07D493/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/43] | Title | German: | FURANOSEDERIVATE | [2012/50] | English: | FURANOSE DERIVATIVES | [2012/50] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE FURANOSE | [2012/50] |
Former [2011/43] | Furanosederivate | ||
Former [2011/43] | Furanose Derivatives | ||
Former [2011/43] | Dérivés de furanose | Examination procedure | 26.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/24] | 09.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/37] | 23.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/37] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08762340.1 / EP2170916 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.12.2012 | 30.06.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0409281 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [AD] 1-8; | [A]US2004102511 (SATTIGERI JITENDRA [IN], et al) [A] 1-8; | [AD]US2006252816 (WANG FAN [CA], et al)[AD] 1-8 | by applicant | US5003080 | US5273995 | US2006252816 | - JOURNAL OF AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1977), vol. 99, page 182 | - JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1983), vol. 48, page 3566 | - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1979), vol. 26, page 2433 |