Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
15.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2018 [2018/03] |
05.09.2017 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
23.08.2017 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
16.12.2016 | Publication of search report | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
16.12.2016 | Change - classification | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
03.08.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.08.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.08.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.08.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.01.2012 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.01.2012 [2012/02] |