EP2405240 - Magnetic angle sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2018 [2018/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Melexis Tessenderlo NV Transportstraat 1 3980 Tessenderlo / BE | [2012/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laville, Arnaud Orangerie 5 2000 Neuchatel / CH | 02 /
Poezart, Mathieu Rue de la Reusiere 5 2024 Saint-Aubi / CH | [2012/02] | Representative(s) | Falk, Urs Patentanwaltsbüro Dr. Urs Falk Eichholzweg 9A 6312 Steinhausen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/02] | Falk, Urs Patentanwaltsbüro Dr. Urs Falk Eichholzweg 9A 6312 Steinhausen / CH | Application number, filing date | 11172314.4 | 01.07.2011 | [2012/02] | Priority number, date | CH20100001108 | 05.07.2010 Original published format: CH 11082010 | [2012/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2405240 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2405240 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/14 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
G01D5/145 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Magnetischer Winkelsensor | [2012/02] | English: | Magnetic angle sensor | [2012/02] | French: | Capteur d'angle magnétique | [2012/02] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/03] | 24.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP2003194574 (ASAHI KASEI CORP) [I] 1-3 * abstract *; | [I]WO2005054784 (SENTRON AG [CH], et al) [I] 1-3 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021]; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP1668378 (SENTRON AG [CH]) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [IY]DE10320057 (SCHOEDLBAUER DIETER [DE]) [I] 1-3 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0014]; figure 1 * [Y] 1-3 | by applicant | WO9616316 | EP1182461 |