EP2380509 - APPARATUS FOR DEPLOYMENT OF A HEMOSTATIC CLIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/43] | Through the scope tension member release clip | ||
[2019/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scimed Life Systems, Inc. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, Minnesota 55311-1566 / US | [2019/16] |
Former [2011/43] | For all designated states Scimed Life Systems, Inc. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, Minnesota 55311-1566 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Durgin, Russel F. 146 Knott Street Attleboro, MA 02703 / US | 02 /
Kelly, William C. Mers 5420 Foxwood Drive Crestwood, KY 40014 / US | 03 /
Wolf, Lance Alan 4160 Andrew Drive Floyds Knobs, IN 47119 / US | 04 /
Wells, Brian Keith 2800 Bittersweet Lane LaGrange, KY 40031 / US | 05 /
Abramov, Vasily P. 2356 Page Ave Louisville, KY 40205 / US | 06 /
Furnish, Gregory R. 2614 Top Hill Road Louisville, KY 40206 / US | [2019/16] |
Former [2011/43] | 01 /
Durgin, Russel F. 146 Knott Street Attleboro, MA Massachusetts 02703 / US | ||
02 /
Kelly, William C. Mers 5420 Foxwood Drive Crestwood, KY Kentucky 40014 / US | |||
03 /
Wolf, Lance Alan 4160 Andrew Drive Floyds Knobs, IN Indiana 47119 / US | |||
04 /
Wells, Brian Keith 2800 Bittersweet Lane LaGrange, KY Kentucky 40031 / US | |||
05 /
Abramov, Vasily P. 2356 Page Ave Louisville, KY Kentucky 40205 / US | |||
06 /
Furnish, Gregory R. 2614 Top Hill Road Louisville, KY Kentucky 40206 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/16] |
Former [2014/27] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/43] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimstaler Strasse 12 10719 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 11172702.0 | 30.09.2004 | [2011/43] | Priority number, date | US20030674512 | 30.09.2003 Original published format: US 674512 | US20040568418P | 05.05.2004 Original published format: US 568418 P | US20040955624 | 30.09.2004 Original published format: US 955624 | [2011/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2380509 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2380509 | Date: | 09.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2380509 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/128, A61B17/122 | [2011/43] | CPC: |
A61B17/1285 (EP,US);
A61B17/122 (EP,US);
A61B17/1227 (EP,US);
A61B34/76 (EP,US);
A61B2017/003 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00845 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00849 (EP,US);
A61B2017/12004 (EP,US);
A61B2017/292 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/16] |
Former [2011/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM SETZEN EINES HÄMOSTASE-CLIPS | [2019/13] | English: | APPARATUS FOR DEPLOYMENT OF A HEMOSTATIC CLIP | [2019/13] | French: | APPAREIL POUR LE DEPLOYMENT D'UNE PINCE HÉMOSTATIQUE | [2019/13] |
Former [2011/43] | Endoskop-Spannungsglied-Freigabeklemme | ||
Former [2011/43] | Through the scope tension member release clip | ||
Former [2011/43] | Pince de relachement de l'element de tension a travers l'endoscope | Examination procedure | 09.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/09] | 23.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.05.2018 | 16.05.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04789465.4 / EP1670365 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040789465) is 27.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.09.2004 | AT | 17.04.2019 | CY | 17.04.2019 | CZ | 17.04.2019 | DK | 17.04.2019 | EE | 17.04.2019 | ES | 17.04.2019 | FI | 17.04.2019 | IT | 17.04.2019 | MC | 17.04.2019 | NL | 17.04.2019 | PL | 17.04.2019 | RO | 17.04.2019 | SE | 17.04.2019 | SI | 17.04.2019 | SK | 17.04.2019 | TR | 17.04.2019 | BG | 17.07.2019 | GR | 18.07.2019 | PT | 17.08.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | LU | 30.09.2019 | [2021/33] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CY | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
LU | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
LU | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
LU | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 17.04.2019 | |
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 17.04.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4627444 (BROOKER DORIS C [US]); | [A]US5156609 (NAKAO NAOMI L [US], et al); | [XYI]US2002045909 (KIMURA KOH [JP], et al) | Examination | WO03030746 |