EP2447285 - Low molecular weight heparin composition and uses thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Momenta Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 675 West Kendall Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2012/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sundaram, Mallikarjun c/o Balaji Sundaram 25 Penny Lane Flemington, NJ New Jersey 08812 / US | 02 /
Venkataraman, Ganesh 215 Concord Road Bedford, MA Massachusetts 01730 / US | 03 /
Oliver, Patricia 5 Tupelo Way Acton, MA Massachusetts 01720 / US | 04 /
Yao, Yiming 9 Lill Avenue West Newton, MA Massachusetts 01465 / US | 05 /
Mamuwala, Zainab Sirajbhai 131 Broadway Apartment No. 3 Arlington, MA 02474 / US | 06 /
Fier, Ian 2 Adams Circle Southborough, MA Massachusetts 01772 / US | 07 /
Qi, Yi Wei 8318 Prestwick Dr. Manlius, NY 13104 / US | 08 /
Shriver, Zachary 21 Mount Pleasant Street Winchester, MA 01890 / US | 09 /
Capila, Ishan 50 Kings Row Ashland, MA Massachusetts 01721 / US | 10 /
Gunay, Nur Sibel 26 Holly Lane, Unit 24 Chestnut Hill, MA 02467 / US | 11 /
Beccati, Daniela 34 S. Russell Street appt. 4 Boston, MA Massachusetts 02114 / US | 12 /
Liu, Cuihua 16 Merrill Avenue Belmont, MA Massachusetts 02478 / US | 13 /
Bauer, Corinne 627 Concord Road Sudbury, MA Massachusetts 01176 / US | 14 /
Li, Ying 16 Marigold Ave. Wellesley, MA Massachusetts 02482 / US | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Simpson, Tobias Rutger, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | Simpson, Tobias Rutger, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2012/18] | Duckett, Anthony Joseph, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11172772.3 | 24.05.2007 | [2012/18] | Priority number, date | US20060809136P | 25.05.2006 Original published format: US 809136 P | US20060849578P | 04.10.2006 Original published format: US 849578 P | US20060849628P | 05.10.2006 Original published format: US 849628 P | [2012/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2447285 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2447285 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08B37/10, A61K31/727 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
C08B37/0078 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/04 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/18] | Title | German: | Heparinzusammensetzung mit geringem Molekulargewicht und Anwendungen dafür | [2012/18] | English: | Low molecular weight heparin composition and uses thereof | [2012/18] | French: | Composition d'héparine à faible poids moléculaire et utilisations associées | [2012/18] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/03] | 23.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/03] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07797722.1 / EP2019843 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070797722) is 26.06.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 23.11.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 23.11.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.12.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 23.11.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 23.11.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.12.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0244236 (NOVO INDUSTRI AS [DK]) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9855515 (HAMILTON CIVIC HOSPITALS RES [CA], et al) [A] 1-28 * page 10, line 8 - line 32 * * page 12, line 6 - line 23 * * claim - *; | [A]US5849721 (UZAN ANDRE [FR]) [A] 1-28 * column 2, line 23 - line 53 * * column 3, line 28 - line 43 *; | [X]WO0102443 (HAMILTON CIVIC HOSPITALS RES [CA], et al) [X] 1-26 * example -; claim -; table 1 *; | [A]WO0208295 (AVENTIS PHARMA SA [FR]) [A] 1-28 * claim - *; | [A]WO2004033503 (AVENTIS PHARMA SA [FR]) [A] 1-28 * claim - *; | CN1554671 [ ] (ZHAOFENG KEDA PHARMACEUTICAL C [CN]); | [A]WO2005010051 (AVENTIS PHARMA SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-28 * claim - *; | [I] - PANGRAZZI J ET AL, "Antithrombotic and bleeding effects of a low molecular weight heparin fraction", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, PERGAMON, OXFORD, GB, vol. 34, no. 18, doi:10.1016/0006-2952(85)90350-8, ISSN 0006-2952, (19850915), pages 3305 - 3308, (19850915), XP023736774 [I] 27,28 * page 3305, paragraphs 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-2952(85)90350-8 | [I] - "Process for preparing low mol. wt. heparin", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20050915), Database accession no. 143:235299, URL: STN, XP002668099 [I] 27,28 * abstract * | by applicant | US5681733 | US5896789 | US5919693 | WO0232406 | - LINHARDT ET AL., BIOCHEM. J., (1988), vol. 254, pages 781 - 787 | - CHUANG ET AL., J. CHROMATOGR. A, (2001), vol. 932, pages 65 - 74 | - YATES ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2004), vol. 47, pages 277 - 280 | - RHOMBERG ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A., (1988), vol. 95, no. 8, pages 4176 - 81 | - GUERRINI ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (2005), vol. 337, pages 35 - 47 | - HARRISON'S, Principles of Internal Medicine, MCGRAW HILL, INC. | - HUANG, J., SHIMAMURA, A., COAGULATION DISORDERS, (1998), vol. 12, pages 1251 - 1281 | - HENNEKENS ET AL., J AM COLL CARDIOL, (1995), vol. 25, no. 7, pages 18S - 22S | - HOLMES ET AL., J AM COLL CARDIOL, (1995), vol. 25, no. 7, pages 10S - 17S | - J. HIRSH ET AL., "Heparin and low-molecular-weight heparin: mechanisms of action, pharmacokinetics, dosing, monitoring, efficacy, and safety", CHEST., (2001), vol. 119, pages 64S - 94S | - U. CORNELLI, J. FAREED, "Human pharmacokinetics of low molecular weight heparins", SEMIN THROMB HEMOST., (1999), vol. 25, no. 3, pages 57 - 61 |