EP2418746 - Device socket for installation devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OBO Bettermann GmbH & Co. KG Hüingser Ring 52 58710 Menden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | For all designated states OBO Bettermann GmbH & Co. KG Huingser Ring 52 58710 Menden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Raschke, Jörg Alte Strasse 7 51674 Wiehl / DE | [2012/07] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 11172859.8 | 06.07.2011 | [2012/07] | Priority number, date | DE20101034862 | 13.08.2010 Original published format: DE102010034862 | [2012/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2418746 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2418746 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/08, H02G3/12 | [2012/07] | CPC: |
H02G3/086 (EP);
B25H3/04 (EP);
B25H3/06 (EP);
H02G3/121 (EP);
H02G3/085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gerätedose für Installationsgeräte | [2012/07] | English: | Device socket for installation devices | [2012/07] | French: | Boîtier d'appareillage pour appareils dýinstallation | [2012/07] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/44] | 06.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0473481 (PLANET WATTOHM SA [FR]) [X] 1-5,8-10 * the whole document * [A] 6,7; | [X]DE2212901 (SCHOENHERR COMBINORM SCHALTANL) [X] 1,2 * figures 1,2 * |