EP2402443 - Therapeutic uses of inhibitors of rtp801 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2016 [2016/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quark Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 6501 Dumbarton Circle Fremont, California 94555 / US | For all designated states Silence Therapeutics AG Robert-Rössle-Strasse 10 13125 Berlin / DE | [2012/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feinstein, Elena 13/55 HaCarmel Street 76305 Rehovot / IL | 02 /
Skaliter, Rami 10/7 David Elazar Street 74027 Nes Ziona / IL | [2012/05] | Representative(s) | Sellin, Carole, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S 88, Boulevard des Belges 69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [2012/01] | Application number, filing date | 11172942.2 | 18.01.2007 | [2012/01] | Priority number, date | US20060760586P | 20.01.2006 Original published format: US 760586 P | US20060796901P | 01.05.2006 Original published format: US 796901 P | US20060851000P | 10.10.2006 Original published format: US 851000 P | [2012/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2402443 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2402443 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, A61K31/713, // A61P27/16, A61P27/02 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
A61K31/7088 (KR);
A61K31/70 (KR);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07K14/4747 (EP,US);
C07K16/22 (EP,US);
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US);
C12N2310/321 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12N2310/321, C12N2310/3521 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Therapeutische Verwendungen von RTP801-Hemmern | [2012/01] | English: | Therapeutic uses of inhibitors of rtp801 | [2012/01] | French: | Utilisations thérapeutiques d'inhibiteurs de rtp801 | [2012/01] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/41] | 17.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/41] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07718224.4 / EP1984003 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2004015107 (ATUGEN AG [DE], et al) [AD] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004035615 (ATUGEN AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-19 * example 10 *; | [AP]WO2006023544 (QUARK BIOTECH INC [US]) [AP] 1-19 * page 134; table B; compound 67 ** page 137; table C; compound 131 *; | [A] - NUTTALL, A., "Sound-induced cochlear ischemia/hypoxia as a mechanism of hearing loss", NOISE & HEALTH, (1999), vol. 5, pages 17 - 31, XP002501638 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | [A] - HOLLEY ET AL, "Keynote review: The auditory system, hearing loss and potential targets for drug development", DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY, (20051001), vol. 10, no. 19, ISSN 1359-6446, pages 1269 - 1282, XP005105967 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1359-6446(05)03595-6 | [A] - SCHWARZER ROLF ET AL, "REDD1 integrates hypoxia-mediated survival signaling downstream of phosphatidylinositol 3-kinase", ONCOGENE, (20050210), vol. 24, no. 7, ISSN 0950-9232, pages 1138 - 1149, XP002353260 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1208236 | [A] - BRAFMAN, A. ET AL., "Inhibition of oxygen-induced retinopathy in RTP801-deficient mice.", INVESTIGATIVE OPHTHALMOLOGY & VISUAL SCIENCE, (200410), vol. 45, no. 10, ISSN 0146-0404, pages 3796 - 3805, XP002501841 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1167/IOVS.04-0052 | by applicant | US4439196 | US4444887 | US4447233 | US4447224 | US4475196 | US4486194 | US4487603 | EP0239400 | US4716111 | US4925678 | US4959217 | WO9109967 | WO9110741 | US5167616 | US5169383 | EP0519596 | US5218088 | US5225539 | US5225347 | US5225182 | WO9323569 | EP0592106 | US5530101 | US5565332 | WO9634096 | WO9633735 | US5580859 | US5585089 | US5589466 | US5593972 | WO9816654 | WO9824893 | WO9846645 | WO9850433 | WO9909046 | US5898031 | EP0586520 | US6107094 | US6121426 | WO0105998 | WO0112659 | EP0618925 | WO0170979 | WO0177289 | WO0231111 | WO0244321 | WO0246465 | US6423493 | US2002119463 | US6455674 | WO02101075 | WO03010205 | US6555667 | US2003108871 | WO03070918 | US2003165864 | JP2003259877 | WO03101283 | US6673549 | US2004019001 | WO2004015107 | EP1394274 | WO2004018999 | US2004063654 | US6740738 | - PETTY TL., "Definition, epidemiology, course, and prognosis of COPD", CLIN. CORNERSTONE, (2003), pages 5 - 10 | - TUDER RM, "Oxidative stress and apoptosis interact and cause emphysema due to vascular endothelial growth factor blocade", AM J RESPIR CELL MOL BIOL, (2003), vol. 29, doi:doi:10.1165/rcmb.2002-0228OC, pages 88 - 97, XP009144404 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1165/rcmb.2002-0228OC | - ERIKSSON, S., "Pulmonary Emphysema and Alphal-Antitrypsin Deficiency", ACTA MED SCAND, (1964), vol. 175, pages 197 - 205 | - JOOS, L., PARE, P.D., SANDFORD, A.J., "Genetic risk factors of chronic obstructive pulmonary disease", SWISS MED WKLY, (2002), vol. 132, pages 27 - 37 | - HAUTAMAKI ET AL., "Requirement for macrophage elastase for cigarette smoke-induced emphysema in mice", SCIENCE, vol. 277, doi:doi:10.1126/science.277.5334.2002, pages 2002 - 2004, XP002258397 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.277.5334.2002 | - ZHENG, T. ET AL., "Inducible targeting ofIL-13 to the adult lung causes matrix metalloproteinase- and cathepsin-dependent emphysema", J CLIN INVEST, (2000), vol. 106, pages 1081 - 1093 | - RANGASAMI T ET AL., "Genetic ablation of Nrf2 enhances susceptibility to cigarette smoke-iduced emphysema in mice", JOURNAL OF CLININCAL INVESTIGATION | - TUDER RM ET AL., "Oxidative stress and apoptosis interact and cause emphysema due to vascular endothelial growth factor blocade", AM JRESPIR CELL MOL BIOL, (2003), vol. 29, doi:doi:10.1165/rcmb.2002-0228OC, pages 88 - 97, XP009144404 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1165/rcmb.2002-0228OC | - YOKOHORI N, AOSHIBA K, NAGAI A, "Increased levels of cell death and proliferation in alveolar wall cells in patients with pulmonary emphysema", CHEST., (200402), vol. 125, no. 2, pages 626 - 32 | - AOSHIBA K, YOKOHORI N, NAGAI A., "Alveolar wall apoptosis causes lung destruction and emphysematous changes", AM JRESPIR CELL MOL BIOL., (200305), vol. 28, no. 5, pages 555 - 62 | - HULEA SA ET AL., "Cigarette smoking causes biochemical changes in blood that are suggestive of oxidative stress: a case-control study", J ENVIRON PATHOL TOXICOL ONCOL., (1995), vol. 14, no. 3-4, pages 173 - 80 | - RAHMAN I, MACNEE W., "Lung glutathione and oxidative stress: implications in cigarette smoke-induced airway disease", AM J PHYSIOL., (199912), vol. 277, pages L1067 - 88 | - MACNEE W., "Oxidants/antioxidants and COPD", CHEST., (200005), vol. 117, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1378/chest.117.5_suppl_1.303S-a, pages 303S - 17S, XP003015003 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1378/chest.117.5_suppl_1.303S-a | - MARWICK JA, KIRKHAM P, GILMOUR PS, DONALDSON K, MACNEE W, RAHMAN I., "Cigarette smoke-induced oxidative stress and TGF-betal increase p21waf1/cip1 expression in alveolar epithelial cells", ANN N YACAD SCI., (200211), vol. 973, pages 278 - 83 | - AOSHIBA K, KOINUMA M, YOKOHORI N, NAGAI A., "Immunohistochemical evaluation of oxidative stress in murine lungs after cigarette smoke exposure", INHAL TOXICOL., (200309), vol. 15, no. 10, pages 1029 - 38 | - DEKHUIJZEN PN., "Antioxidant properties of N-acetylcysteine: their relevance in relation to chronic obstructive pulmonary disease", EUR RESPIR J., (200404), vol. 23, no. 4, pages 629 - 36 | - TUDER RM, ZHEN L, CHO CY, TARASEVICIENE-STEWART L, KASAHARA Y, SALVEMINI D, VOELKEL NF, FLORES SC., "Oxidative stress and apoptosis interact and cause emphysema due to vascular endothelial growth factor blocade", AM JRESPIR CELL MOL BIOL, (2003), vol. 29, doi:doi:10.1165/rcmb.2002-0228OC, pages 88 - 97, XP009144404 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1165/rcmb.2002-0228OC | - INHAL TOXICOL., (200309), vol. 15, no. 10, pages 1029 - 38 | - TAKAHASHI A, MASUDA A, SUN M, CENTONZE VE, HERMAN B., "Oxidative stress-induced apoptosis is associated with alterations in mitochondrial caspase activity and Bcl-2-dependent alterations in mitochondrial pH (pHm", BRAIN RES BULL., (20040215), vol. 62, no. 6, pages 497 - 504 | - TANIYAMA Y, GRIENDLING KK., "Reactive oxygen species in the vasculature: molecular and cellular mechanisms", HYPERTENSION, (20031027), vol. 42, no. 6, pages 1075 - 81 | - HIGUCHI Y., "Chromosomal DNA fragmentation in apoptosis and necrosis induced by oxidative stress", BIOCHEM PHARMACOL., (20031015), vol. 66, no. 8, pages 1527 - 35 | - PUNJ V, CHAKRABARTY AM., "Redox proteins in mammalian cell death: an evolutionarily conserved function in mitochondria and prokaryotes", CELL MICROBIOL., (200304), vol. 5, no. 4, pages 225 - 31 | - UEDA S, MASUTANI H, NAKAMURA H, TANAKA T, UENO M, YODOI J., "Redox control of cell death", ANTIOXID REDOX SIGNAL., (200206), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 405 - 14 | - RAHMAN I., "Oxidative stress and gene transcription in asthma and chronic obstructive pulmonary disease: antioxidant therapeutic targets", CURR DRUG TARGETS INFLAMM ALLERGY, (200209), vol. 1, no. 3, doi:doi:10.2174/1568010023344607, pages 291 - 315, XP008038264 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1568010023344607 | - RENARD P, RAES M., "The proinflammatory transcription factor NFkappaB: a potential target for novel therapeutical strategies", CELL BIOL TOXICOL., (1999), vol. 15, no. 6, pages 341 - 4 | - LENTSCH AB, WARD PA., "The NFkappaBb/IkappaB system in acute inflammation", ARCH IMMUNOL THER EXP, (2000), vol. 48, no. 2, pages 59 - 63 | - ANDELA VB, GORDON AH, ZOTALIS G, ROSIER RN, GOATER JJ, LEWIS GD, SCHWARZ EM, PUZAS JE, O'KEEFE RJ., "NFkappaB: a pivotal transcription factor in prostate cancer metastasis to bone", CLIN ORTHOP., (200310), vol. 415, pages 75 - 85 | - FLEENOR DL, PANG IH, CLARK AF., "Involvement of AP-1 in interleukin-lalpha-stimulated MMP-3 expression in human trabecular meshwork cells", INVEST OPHTHALMOL VIS SCI., (200308), vol. 44, no. 8, pages 3494 - 501 | - RUHUL AMIN AR, SENGA T, OO ML, THANT AA, HAMAGUCHI M., "Secretion of matrix metalloproteinase-9 by the proinflammatory cytokine, IL-lbeta: a role for the dual signalling pathways", AKT AND ERK. GENES CELLS, (200306), vol. 8, no. 6, pages 515 - 23 | - YASUNORI KASAHARA, RUBIN M. TUDER, CARLYNE D. COOL, DAVID A. LYNCH, SONIA C. FLORES, NORBERT F. VOELKEL, "Endothelial Cell Death and Decreased Expression of Vascular Endothelial Growth Factor and Vascular Endothelial Growth Factor Receptor 2 in Emphysema", AM J RESPIR CRIT CARE MED, (2001), vol. 163, pages 737 - 744 | - YASUNORI KASAHARA, RUBIN M. TUDER, LAIMUTE TARASEVICIENE-STEWART, TIMOTHY D. LE CRAS, STEVEN ABMAN, PETER K. HIRTH, JOHANNES WALTE, "Inhibition of VEGF receptors causes lung cell apoptosis and emphysema", J. CLIN. INVEST., (2000), vol. 106, pages 1311 - 1319, XP002593900 | - VOELKEL NF, COOL CD., "Pulmonary vascular involvement in chronic obstructive pulmonary disease", EUR RESPIR J, (200311), vol. 46, pages 28S - 32S | - HAMDI, KENNEY, "Age-related Macular degeneration - a new viewpoint", FRONTIERS IN BIOSCIENCE, (200305), pages E305 - 314 | - MILTON, AM J OPHTHALMOL, (1979), vol. 88, page 269 | - MITCHELL ET AL., OPHTHALMOLOGY, (1995), vol. 102, pages 1450 - 1460 | - SMITH ET AL., OPHTHALMOLOGY, (2001), vol. 108, pages 697 - 704 | - KLEIN ET AL., OPHTHALMOLOGY, (1992), vol. 99, pages 933 - 943 | - American Journal of Surgery, ELSEVIER, (20040501), vol. 187 | - AM J PHYSIOL, (2003), vol. 285 | - HYPERT RES, (2002), vol. 25, page 893 | - SAMBUCETI ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2001), vol. 104, page 1129 | - TIWARI, VIKRANT, "Review Article- Sepsis and the Kidney", JOURNAL OF INDIAN ACADEMY OF CLINICAL MEDICINE, vol. 5, no. 1 | - Goodman and Gilman's The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics, MACMILLAN PUBLISHING CO., INC., (1980), pages 1169 - 71 | - ZHANG ET AL., NEUROSCIENCE, (2003), vol. 120, pages 191 - 205 | - WANG ET AL., J. NEUROSCIENCE, vol. 23, no. 24, pages 8596 - 8607 | - TZIPORA SHOSHANI ET AL., "Identification of a Novel Hypoxia-Inducible Factor I-Responsive Gene, RTP801, Involved in Apoptosis", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (200204), doi:doi:10.1128/MCB.22.7.2283-2293.2002, pages 2283 - 2293, XP002267737 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MCB.22.7.2283-2293.2002 | - ANAT BRAFINAN ET AL., "Inhibition of Oxygen-Induced Retinopathy in RTP801-Deficient Mice", INVEST OPHTHALMOL VIS SCI., (200410), vol. 45, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1167/IOVS.04-0052, pages 3796 - 805, XP002633194 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1167/IOVS.04-0052 | - W. ELLISEN ET AL., "REDDl, a Developmentally Regulated Transcriptional Target ofp63 and p53, Links p63 to Regulation of Reactive Oxygen Species", MOLECULAR CELL, (200211), vol. 10, pages 995 - 1005 | - RICHARD DR, BERRA E, POUYSSEGUR J., "Non-hypoxic pathway mediates the induction of hypoxia-inducible factor 1 alpha in vascular smooth muscle cells", J BIOL. CHEM., vol. 275, no. 35, pages 26765 - 71 | - RANGASAMI T ET AL., "Genetic ablation ofNrj2 enhances susceptibility to cigarette smoke-induced emphysema in mice", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION | - SHOSHANI ET AL., MOL CELL BIOL, (2002), vol. 22, pages 2283 - 93 | - ELLISEN ET AL., MOL CELL, vol. 10, pages 995 - 1005 | - HERSKOWITZ I., "Functional inactivation of genes by dominant negative mutations", NATURE, (19870917), vol. 329, no. 6136, doi:doi:10.1038/329219a0, pages 219 - 22, XP002924461 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/329219a0 | - RONINSON IB ET AL., "Genetic suppressor elements: new tools for molecular oncology--thirteenth Cornelius P. Rhoads Memorial Award Lecture", CANCER RES., (19950915), vol. 55, no. 18, page 4023 | - BIBL HAEMATOL., (1965), vol. 23, pages 1165 - 74 | - APPL MICROBIOL., (196707), vol. 15, no. 4, pages 851 - 6 | - CAN J BIOCHEM., (196805), vol. 46, no. 5, pages 441 - 4 | - BIOCHEMISTRY, (196807), vol. 7, no. 7, pages 2574 - 80 | - ARCH BIOCHEM BIOPHYS., (19680910), vol. 126, no. 3, pages 746 - 72 | - BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN., (19700220), vol. 38, no. 4, pages 825 - 30 | - VEGA ET AL., Gene Targeting, CRC PRESS | - PADLAN, MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 28, no. 4, 5, pages 489 - 498 | - STUDNICKA ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1994), vol. 7, no. 6, pages 805 - 814 | - ROGUSKA ET AL., PNAS, (1994), vol. 91, pages 969 - 973 | - FERRARA N., ENDOCR REV., (200408), vol. 25, no. 4, pages 581 - 611 | - TRAXLER P, CANCER RES., (20040715), vol. 64, no. 14, pages 4931 - 41 | - STADLER WM ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES., (20040515), vol. 10, no. 10, pages 3365 - 70 | - FIRE ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 391, page 806 | - ELBASHIR ET AL., GENES DEV., (2001), vol. 15, page 188 | - BERNSTEIN E., DENLI AM., HANNON GJ, "The rest is silence", RNA, (200111), vol. 7, no. 11, pages 1509 - 21, XP009010244 | - NISHIKURA K., "A short primer on RNAi: RNA-directed RNA polymerase acts as a key catalyst", CELL, (20011116), vol. 107, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/S0092-8674(01)00581-5, pages 415 - 8, XP002959440 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0092-8674(01)00581-5 | - NATURE REVIEWS, (2002), vol. 3, pages 737 - 47 | - NATURE, (2002), vol. 418, pages 244 - 51 | - NATURE, (2001), vol. 409, pages 363 - 6 | - NATURE, (2003), vol. 425, pages 415 - 9 | - CURR OPIN MOL THER., (200306), vol. 5, no. 3, pages 217 - 24 | - PEI, TUSCHL, "On the Art of Identifying Effective and Specific siRNAs", NATURE METHODS, (200609), vol. 3, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1038/nmeth911, XP055027555 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth911 | - CHALK AM, WAHLESTEDT C, SONNHAMMER EL., "Improved and automated prediction of effective siRNA", BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (20040618), vol. 319, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bbrc.2004.04.181, pages 264 - 74, XP004509878 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2004.04.181 | - SIOUD M, LEIRDAL M., "Potential design rules and enzymatic synthesis of siRNAs", METHODS MOL BIOL., (2004), vol. 252, pages 457 - 69, XP001181161 | - LEVENKOVA N, GU Q, RUX JJ., "Gene specific siRNA selector", BIOINFORMATICS, (20040212), vol. 20, no. 3, pages 430 - 2, XP002311428 | - UI-TEI K, NAITO Y, TAKAHASHI F, HARAGUCHI T, OHKI-HAMAZAKI H, JUNI A, UEDA R, SAIGO K., "Guidelines for the selection of highly effective siRNA sequences for mammalian and chick RNA interference", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (20040209), vol. 32, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1093/nar/gkh247, pages 936 - 48, XP002329955 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkh247 | - LIU Y, BRAASCH DA, NULF CJ, COREY DR., "Efficient and isoform- selective inhibition of cellular gene expression by peptide nucleic acids", BIOCHEMISTRY, (20040224), vol. 43, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1021/bi0358519, pages 1921 - 7, XP055040311 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi0358519 | - CHIU YL, RANA TM., "siRNA function in RNAi: a chemical modification analysis", RNA, (200309), vol. 9, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1261/rna.5103703, pages 1034 - 48, XP008158876 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1261/rna.5103703 | - PADDISON ET AL., PNAS, (2002), vol. 99, pages 1443 - 1448 | - PADDISON ET AL., GENES & DEV, (2002), vol. 16, pages 948 - 958 | - SUI ET AL., PNAS, (2002), vol. 8, pages 5515 - 5520 | - BRUMMELKAMP ET AL., SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 296, pages 550 - 553 | - SHEN ET AL., FEBS LETTERS, (2003), vol. 539, pages 111 - 114 | - XIA ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2002), vol. 20, pages 1006 - 1010 | - REICH ET AL., MOLECULAR VISION, (2003), vol. 9, pages 210 - 216 | - SORENSEN ET AL., J.MOL.BIOL., (2003), vol. 327, pages 761 - 766 | - LEWIS ET AL., NATURE GENETICS, (2002), vol. 32, pages 107 - 108 | - SIMEONI ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2003), vol. 31, no. 11, pages 2717 - 2724 | - TOLENTINO ET AL., RETINA, (200402), vol. 24, no. 1, pages 132 - 138 | - STEMBERGER, M., SCHMIEDEKNECHT, A., KRETSCHMER, A., GEBHARDT, F., LEENDERS, F., CZAUDEMA, F., VON CARLOWITZ, I., ENGLE, M., GIESE,, ANTISENSE NUCLEIC ACID DRUG DEV, (2002), vol. 12, pages 131 - 43 | - ALI, I. U., JOURNAL OF THE NATIONAL CANCER INSTITUTE, (20000607), vol. 92, no. 11, pages 861 - 863 | - BEAUCAGE S.L., IYER R.P., TETRAHEDRON, (1992), vol. 48, pages 2223 - 2311 | - BEAUCAGE S.L., IYER R.P., TETRAHEDRON, (1993), vol. 49, pages 6123 - 6194 | - CARUTHERS M.H., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 154, pages 287 - 313 | - ECKSTEIN F., ANNU. REV. BIOCHEM., (1985), vol. 54, pages 367 - 402 | - CALABRETTA ET AL., "Antisense strategies in the treatment of leukemias", SEMIN ONCOL., (1996), vol. 23, no. 1, pages 78 - 87, XP000983404 | - WRIGHT, ANAZODO, "Antisense Molecules and Their Potential For The Treatment Of Cancer and AIDS", CANCER J., (1995), vol. 8, pages 185 - 189, XP002089434 | - CROOKE, "Progress in antisense therapeutics", HEMATOL. PATHOL., (1995), vol. 2, page 59 | - UHLMANN, PEYMAN, "Antisense Oligonucleotides: A New Therapeutic Principle", CHEM REV, (1990), vol. 90, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1021/cr00102a001, pages 543 - 584, XP000141412 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cr00102a001 | - WAGNER, "Gene inhibition using antisense oligodeoxynucleotides", NATURE, (1994), vol. 372, page 333 | - HANANIA ET AL., "Recent advances in the application of gene therapy to human disease", AM. J. MED., (1995), vol. 99, page 537 | - SCANLON ET AL., "Oligonucleotides-mediated modulation of mammalian gene expression", FASEB J., (1995), vol. 9, page 1288 | - GEWIRTZ, "Oligodeoxynucleotide-based therapeutics for human leukemias", STEM CELLS DAYT., (1993), vol. 11, page 96 | - LEFEBVRE-DHELLENCOURT ET AL., "Immunomodulation by cytokine antisense oligonucleotides", EUR. CYTOKINE NETW., (1995), vol. 6, page 7, XP000570645 | - AGRAWAL, "Antisense oligonucleotides: towards clinical trials", TIBTECH, (1996), vol. 14, doi:doi:10.1016/0167-7799(96)10053-6, page 376, XP004035728 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-7799(96)10053-6 | - CALABRETTA ET AL., "Antisense strategies in the treatment of leukemias", SEMIN. ONCOL., (1996), vol. 23, page 78, XP000983404 | - GALILEO ET AL., J. CELL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 112, page 1285 | - ROSOLEN ET AL., CANCER RES., (1990), vol. 50, page 6316 | - WHITESELL ET AL., "Episome-generated N-myc antisense RNA restricts the differentiation potential of primitive neuroectodermal cell lines", MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 11, page 1360 | - MORRISON, "Suppression of basic fibroblast growth factor expression by antisense oligonucleotides inhibits the growth of transformed human astrocytes", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1991), vol. 266, page 728 | - AKHTER ET AL., "Interactions of antisense DNA oligonucleotide analogs with phospholipid membranes (liposomes", NUC. RES., (1991), vol. 19, pages 5551 - 5559 | - LOKE ET AL., "Characterization of oligonucleotide transport into living cells", PNAS USA, (1989), vol. 86, page 3474 | - YAKUBOV ET AL., PNAS USA, (1989), vol. 86, page 6454 | - SARVER ET AL., GENE REGULATION AND AIDS, (1990), pages 305 - 325 | - WILBUR, LIPMAN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1983), vol. 80, page 726 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - SMITH ET AL., ADV. APPL. MATH., (1981), vol. 2, pages 482 - 489 | - SMITH ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1983), vol. 11, pages 2205 - 2220 | - DEVEREUX ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1984), vol. 12, pages 387 - 395 | - FENG ET AL., J. MOLEC. EVOL., (1987), vol. 25, pages 351 - 360 | - HIGGINS ET AL., CABIOS, (1989), vol. 5, pages 151 - 153 | - THOMPSON ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1994), vol. 22, pages 4673 - 4680 | - Organic syntheses, J. WILEY, (1941), vol. 1- 79 | - Comprehensive Medicinal Chemistry, PERGAMON PRESS | - CZAUDEMA, F., FECHTNER, M., AYGUN, H., ARNOLD, W., KLIPPEL, A., GIESE, K., KAUFMANN, J., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2003), vol. 31, pages 670 - 82 | - METHODS FIND EXP CLIN PHARMACOL., (199705), vol. 19, no. 4, pages 231 - 9 | - KLIPPEL, A., ESCOBEDO, M.A., WACHOWICZ, M.S., APELL, G., BROWN, T.W., GIEDLIN, M.A., KAVANAUGH, W.M., WILLIAMS, L.T., MOL CELL BIOL, (1998), vol. 18, pages 5699 - 711 | - KLIPPEL, A., REINHARD, C., KAVANAUGH, W.M., APELL, G., ESCOBEDO, M.A., WILLIAMS, L.T., MOL CELL BIOL, (1996), vol. 16, pages 4117 - 27 | - SAKURAI ET AL., IOVS, (2003), vol. 44, pages 3578 - 85 | - SAKURAI ET AL., IOVS, (2003), vol. 44, pages 2743 - 2749 | - CHADER, VISION RESEARCH, (2002), vol. 42, pages 393 - 399 | - AMBATI ET AL., NATURE MEDICINE, (2003), vol. 9, no. 11, pages 1390 - 1397 | - TOLENTINO ET AL., RETINA, (2004), vol. 24, pages 132 - 138 | - RANGASAMY T, CHO CY, THIMMULAPPA, RK, ZHEN L, SRISUMA SS, KENSLER TW, YAMAMOTO M, PETRACHE I, TUDER RM, "Genetic ablation ofNrj2 enhances susceptibility to cigarette smoke-iduced emphysema in mice. Submitted to Journal of Clinincal Investigation", BISWAL S. | - YASUNORI KASAHARA, RUBIN M. TUDER, CARLYNE D. COOL, DAVID A. LYNCH, SONIA C. FLORES, NORBERT F. VOELKEL., "Endothelial Cell Death and Decreased Expression of Vascular Endothelial Growth Factor and Vascular Endothelial Growth Factor Receptor 2 in Emphysema", AM J RESPIR CRIT CARE MED, (2001), vol. 163, pages 737 - 744 | - LONGA ET AL., STROKE, (1989), vol. 30, page 84 | - DOGAN ET AL., J. NEUROCHEM., (1999), vol. 72, page 765 | - TAMURA A. ET AL., J CEREB BLOOD FLOW METAB., (1981), vol. 1, pages 53 - 60 | - MIYAJI T, HU X, YUEN PS, MURAMATSU Y, IYER S, HEWITT SM, STAR RA, "Ethyl pyruvate decreases sepsis-induced acute renal failure and multiple organ damage in aged mice", KIDNEY INT., (200311), vol. 64, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1046/j.1523-1755.2003.00268.x, pages 1620 - 31, XP002405486 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1523-1755.2003.00268.x | - KELLY KJ, PLOTKIN Z, VULGAMOTT SL, DAGHER PC, "P53 mediates the apoptotic response to GTP depletion after renal ischemia- reperfusion: protective role of a p53 inhibitor", J AM SOC NEPHROL., (200301), vol. 14, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1097/01.ASN.0000040596.23073.01, pages 128 - 38, XP002632231 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/01.ASN.0000040596.23073.01 | - USMAN ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1987), vol. 109, page 7845 | - SCARINGE ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1990), vol. 18, page 5433 | - WINCOTT ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1995), vol. 23, pages 2677 - 2684 | - WINCOTT ET AL., METHODS MOL. BIO., (1997), vol. 74, page 59 | - MOORE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 256, page 9923 | - SHABAROVA ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1991), vol. 19, page 4247 | - BELLON ET AL., NUCLEOSIDES & NUCLEOTIDES, (1997), vol. 16, page 951 | - BELLON ET AL., BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (1997), vol. 8, page 204 | - WEISS ET AL., HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1999), vol. 10, pages 2287 - 2293 | - DENSMORE ET AL., MOLECULAR THERAPY, (1999), vol. 1, pages 180 - 188 | - GAUTAM ET AL., MOLECULAR THERAPY, (2001), vol. 3, pages 551 - 556 | - SHAHIWALA, MISRA, AAPS PHARMSCITECH, (2004), vol. 5 | - TANAKA ET AL., HEAR RES., (200303), vol. 177, no. 1-2, pages 21 - 31 | - SONG ET AL., "Antibody mediated in vivo delivery of small interfering RNAs via cell-surface receptors", NAT BIOTECHNOL., (200506), vol. 23, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt1101, pages 709 - 17, XP002390626 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1101 | - DING ET AL., HEARING RESEARCH, (2002), vol. 164, pages 115 - 126 | - WANG ET AL., THE JOURNAL OFNEUROSCIENCE, vol. 23, no. 24, pages 8596 - 8607 | - WANG ET AL., THE JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, vol. 23, no. 24, pages 8596 - 8607 |