EP2377527 - Polyelectrolyte precipitation and purification of antibodies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2011/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fahrner, Robert L. Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA California 94080 / US | 02 /
Franklin, Jayme Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA California 94080 / US | 03 /
McDonald, Paul J. Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA California 94080 / US | 04 /
Peram, Thanmaya Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA California 94080 / US | 05 /
Sisodiya, Vikram Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA California 94080 / US | 06 /
Victa, Corazon Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA California 94080 / US | [2011/42] | Representative(s) | van der Hoff, Hilary Mary Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | van der Hoff, Hilary Mary Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2011/42] | King, Hilary Mary Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 11173495.0 | 10.01.2008 | [2011/42] | Priority number, date | US20070886068P | 22.01.2007 Original published format: US 886068 P | US20070013446P | 13.12.2007 Original published format: US 13446 P | [2011/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2377527 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2377527 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/198, C07K1/32, C07K1/36, C07K16/00, C07K16/28 | [2011/42] | CPC: |
C07K16/00 (EP,US);
C07K1/36 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/198 (KR);
C07K1/32 (EP,US);
C07K16/28 (KR);
C07K16/2803 (EP,US);
C07K16/2863 (EP,US);
C07K16/2878 (EP,US);
C07K16/2887 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/42] | Extension states | AL | 22.03.2012 | BA | 22.03.2012 | MK | 22.03.2012 | RS | 22.03.2012 | Title | German: | Abscheidung von Polyelektrolyten und Reinigung von Antikörpern | [2011/42] | English: | Polyelectrolyte precipitation and purification of antibodies | [2011/42] | French: | Précipitation de polyélectrolyte et purification de protéines | [2011/42] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 17.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08705841.8 / EP2120915 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.01.2008 | AT | 17.07.2013 | BE | 17.07.2013 | BG | 17.07.2013 | CY | 17.07.2013 | CZ | 17.07.2013 | DK | 17.07.2013 | EE | 17.07.2013 | FI | 17.07.2013 | HR | 17.07.2013 | LT | 17.07.2013 | LV | 17.07.2013 | MC | 17.07.2013 | MT | 17.07.2013 | PL | 17.07.2013 | RO | 17.07.2013 | SI | 17.07.2013 | SK | 17.07.2013 | TR | 17.07.2013 | NO | 17.10.2013 | GR | 18.10.2013 | IS | 17.11.2013 | PT | 18.11.2013 | IE | 10.01.2014 | LU | 10.01.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 10.01.2008 | |
AT | 17.07.2013 | ||
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
MT | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
IE | 10.01.2014 | ||
LU | 10.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
MT | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
IE | 10.01.2014 | ||
LU | 10.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
MT | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
IE | 10.01.2014 | ||
LU | 10.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
IE | 10.01.2014 | ||
LU | 10.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
IE | 10.01.2014 | ||
LU | 10.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
LU | 10.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 17.07.2013 | |
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 17.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5641870 (RINDERKNECHT ERNST H [US], et al); | [A]WO0000038 (MICHAEL FOODS INC [US]); | [I]WO2004092393 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al); | by applicant | EP0012023 | USRE30985E | WO8303679 | EP0105360 | US4515893 | US4560655 | EP0171496 | EP0173494 | WO8601533 | EP0183070 | EP0184187 | WO8700195 | EP0217577 | US4657866 | WO8702671 | EP0244234 | US4767704 | US4816567 | US4816397 | DD266710 | WO9003430 | US4927762 | US4946778 | EP0402226 | US5091313 | US5122469 | WO9304173 | WO9308829 | US5225539 | WO9404690 | EP0420937 | WO9519181 | WO9523865 | US5545806 | WO9630046 | US5569825 | WO9640210 | US5595721 | US5622700 | US5625126 | US5633425 | WO9726912 | US5661016 | US5672347 | US5677180 | US5693762 | US5714338 | WO9806248 | US5721108 | US5725856 | US5736137 | WO9823761 | WO9845331 | WO9851793 | US6087448 | US6127526 | WO0075348 | WO0140309 | US6333398 | WO03002607 | US2003219433 | WO2004014942 | WO2004035607 | US2004093621 | US6743625 | WO2004056312 | WO2004103404 | WO2005000901 | US2005025764 | WO2005014618 | WO2005016969 | US6870034 | US6872568 | US2005069545 | US2005106108 | WO2005044859 | US2005123546 | WO2005070963 | US2005186216 | US2005202534 | US2005202028 | US2005202023 | WO2005103081 | US7169908 | US2007193938 |