EP2410355 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING AN ORIENTATION OF A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2019/11] |
Former [2012/04] | For all designated states General Electric Company a New York Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wootten, Keith Robert Ford Lane Bramshill Hook, Hampshire RG27 0RH / GB | [2012/04] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth, et al Baker Hughes 245 Hammersmith Chalk Hill Road London W6 8DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/11] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | ||
Former [2012/04] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 11173960.3 | 14.07.2011 | [2012/04] | Priority number, date | US20100840615 | 21.07.2010 Original published format: US 840615 | [2012/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2410355 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2410355 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2410355 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01V11/00, G01C9/10 | [2017/47] | CPC: |
G01V11/00 (EP,US);
G01C9/10 (EP,US);
G01C2009/107 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/04] | G01V11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/26] |
Former [2012/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Ausrichtung einer Vorrichtung | [2012/04] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING AN ORIENTATION OF A DEVICE | [2012/04] | French: | Système et procédé pour déterminer l'orientation d'un dispositif | [2012/04] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2011 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/26] | 04.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2018 | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.07.2011 | AL | 13.03.2019 | AT | 13.03.2019 | CY | 13.03.2019 | CZ | 13.03.2019 | DK | 13.03.2019 | EE | 13.03.2019 | ES | 13.03.2019 | FI | 13.03.2019 | HR | 13.03.2019 | IT | 13.03.2019 | LT | 13.03.2019 | LV | 13.03.2019 | MC | 13.03.2019 | MK | 13.03.2019 | MT | 13.03.2019 | NL | 13.03.2019 | PL | 13.03.2019 | RO | 13.03.2019 | RS | 13.03.2019 | SE | 13.03.2019 | SI | 13.03.2019 | SK | 13.03.2019 | SM | 13.03.2019 | TR | 13.03.2019 | BG | 13.06.2019 | NO | 13.06.2019 | GR | 14.06.2019 | IS | 13.07.2019 | PT | 13.07.2019 | IE | 14.07.2019 | LU | 14.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | FR | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 14.07.2011 | |
AL | 13.03.2019 | ||
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CY | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
MT | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
IE | 14.07.2019 | ||
LU | 14.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 14.07.2011 | |
AL | 13.03.2019 | ||
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CY | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
IE | 14.07.2019 | ||
LU | 14.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CY | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
IE | 14.07.2019 | ||
LU | 14.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
IE | 14.07.2019 | ||
LU | 14.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
LU | 14.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
LU | 14.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 13.03.2019 | |
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 13.03.2019 | |
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE19723069 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * page 3, line 53 - page 4, line 4; figure 2 *[A] 10,11; | [YA]US2002144418 (ENDO MICHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0074] - [0088] - [0097] - [0104] * [A] 10,11; | [XY]US2005140362 (RHODES MICHAEL L [US], et al) [X] 10-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0020] - [0032] * [Y] 1-9 |