EP2420400 - Vehicle with cover device for loading structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fliegl, Josef Bürgermeister- Boch-Strasse 1 84453 Mühldorf / DE | [2013/50] |
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Fliegl, Josef Söderbergstrasse 5 84513 Töging / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/08] | Representative(s) | Tetzner, Michael, et al Tetzner & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/27] | Tetzner, Michael, et al TETZNER & PARTNER mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/08] | Tetzner, Michael, et al Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11174000.7 | 14.07.2011 | [2012/08] | Priority number, date | DE20102008320U | 20.08.2010 Original published format: DE 202010008320 U | [2012/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2420400 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2420400 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2420400 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/16, B60J7/14 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
B60J7/141 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/08] | B60J7/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/08] | Title | German: | Fahrzeug mit Abdeckvorrichtung für den Ladeaufbau | [2012/08] | English: | Vehicle with cover device for loading structure | [2012/08] | French: | Véhicule avec dispositif de toit ouvrant pour le plateau arrière | [2012/08] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/05] | 28.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 02.07.2014 | CY | 02.07.2014 | DK | 02.07.2014 | EE | 02.07.2014 | ES | 02.07.2014 | FI | 02.07.2014 | HR | 02.07.2014 | IT | 02.07.2014 | LT | 02.07.2014 | LV | 02.07.2014 | MC | 02.07.2014 | MK | 02.07.2014 | MT | 02.07.2014 | NL | 02.07.2014 | RO | 02.07.2014 | RS | 02.07.2014 | SE | 02.07.2014 | SI | 02.07.2014 | SK | 02.07.2014 | SM | 02.07.2014 | TR | 02.07.2014 | IE | 14.07.2014 | LU | 14.07.2014 | BE | 31.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | BG | 02.10.2014 | NO | 02.10.2014 | GR | 03.10.2014 | IS | 02.11.2014 | PT | 03.11.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
MK | 02.07.2014 | ||
MT | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
SM | 02.07.2014 | ||
TR | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 14.07.2014 | ||
LU | 14.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
MT | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
SM | 02.07.2014 | ||
TR | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 14.07.2014 | ||
LU | 14.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
MT | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
SM | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 14.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
MT | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
SM | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 14.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
SM | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 14.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 14.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 14.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 02.07.2014 | |
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 02.07.2014 | |
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 02.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE3529524 (GERGEN ENGELBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,7,9,11 * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 3; figures 1,3,5 * [Y] 8,10; | [X]GB2405846 (FAHY MICHAEL JOSEPH PATRICK [GB]) [X] 1,2,11 * figures 1-4; claims 1-6 *; | [YA]US2007236042 (SMITH FRED P [US], et al) [Y] 8,10 * paragraphs [0033] , [0038]; figures 1-3,5 * [A] 1 | by applicant | US6402233 | US6402223 | DE102007043818 |