EP2545891 - Patch package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2013/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Minoru Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Keiji Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 03 /
Konno, Masakatsu Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 04 /
Yaegashi, Hiroyuki Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 05 /
Izaki, Toshiharu Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 06 /
Sakuraba, Ryohei Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2013/03] | Representative(s) | Hopkin, Tobias John Buxton J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Hopkin, Tobias J.B. J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11174041.1 | 14.07.2011 | [2013/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2545891 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61F15/00, A61F13/00, A61K9/70 | [2013/03] | CPC: |
A61F15/002 (EP);
A61F13/00 (EP);
A61F13/00063 (EP);
A61F13/00072 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Pflasterverpackung | [2013/03] | English: | Patch package | [2013/03] | French: | Emballage de timbre | [2013/03] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/33] | 14.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/02] | 25.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.08.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP1612158 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [XD] 1-11 * claims 1-12 *; | [X]US4304333 (KOZLOW SR WILLIAM) [X] 1 * figure 4 * * column 2, line 40 - column 2, line 46 * | by applicant | JP2006044793 |