EP2412905 - Hinge for shower door [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lakes Bathrooms Limited 5800 Shannon Place Tewkesbury Business Park Tewkesbury, Gloucestershire GL20 8SL / GB | [2012/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Howsam, Christopher Guy 6 Hillside Close Teignmouth, Devon TQ14 9XE / GB | 02 /
Sangeorzan, George Flat 2 7 The Triangle Teignmouth, Devon TQ14 8AU / GB | [2012/05] | Representative(s) | March, Gary Clifford, et al Avidity IP Broers Building, Hauser Forum 21 J J Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/01] | Symons, Rupert Jonathan, et al Clifton Cowley Legal 25 Meer Street Stratford-upon-Avon Warwickshire CV37 6QB / GB | ||
Former [2013/22] | Lessard, Jason Donat, et al Clifton Cowley Legal 25 Meer Street Stratford-upon-Avon, Warks. CV37 6QB / GB | ||
Former [2012/05] | Lessard, Jason Donat Hepworth Browne 29 Wood Street Stratford-upon-Avon Warwickshire, CV37 6JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 11174367.0 | 18.07.2011 | [2012/05] | Priority number, date | GB20100012847 | 30.07.2010 Original published format: GB 201012847 | [2012/19] |
Former [2012/05] | GB20100012847 | 30.07.2010 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2412905 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2412905 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E05D7/04 | [2012/05] | CPC: |
E05D7/0423 (EP);
E05Y2600/31 (EP);
E05Y2800/16 (EP);
E05Y2800/672 (EP);
E05Y2900/114 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Scharnier für Duschtür | [2012/05] | English: | Hinge for shower door | [2012/05] | French: | Charnière pour porte de douche | [2012/05] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/34] | 12.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE20004106U (NIEMANN HANS DIETER [DE]) [X] 1-6,8,9,11 * abstract *; | [X]US4209946 (AKAI TSUTOMU [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,8-10 * abstract *; | [XI]EP1439276 (KIEFER ZOLTAN ANTON [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-9,11-14 * abstract * [I] 10; | [A]FR2686931 (ROTO FRANK EISENWAREN [AT]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE102004042924 (SIMONSWERK GMBH) [A] 10 * paragraph [0017] * | by applicant | DE2758333 |