EP2409820 - Cutting tools having movable cover mounting structures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Makita Corporation 3-11-8, Sumiyoshi-cho Anjo, Aichi 446-8502 / JP | [2012/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inai, Masahiko c/o MAKITA CORPORATION 3-11-8, Sumiyoshi-cho Anjo, Aichi 446-8502 / JP | 02 /
Kani, Toshiyuki c/o MAKITA CORPORATION 3-11-8, Sumiyoshi-cho Anjo, Aichi 446-8502 / JP | 03 /
Aoyama, Syuji c/o MAKITA CORPORATION 3-11-8, Sumiyoshi-cho Anjo, Aichi 446-8502 / JP | 04 /
Tomita, Shinichiro c/o MAKITA CORPORATION 3-11-8, Sumiyoshi-cho Anjo, Aichi 446-8502 / JP | [2017/13] |
Former [2012/04] | 01 /
Inai, Masahiko c/o MAKITA CORPORATION 3-11-8, Sumiyoshi-cho Anjo, Aichi 446-8502 / JP | ||
02 /
Kani, Toshiyuki c/o MAKITA CORPORATION 3-11-8, Sumiyoshi-cho Anjo, Aichi 446-8502 / JP | |||
03 /
Aoyama, Syuji c/o MAKITA CORPORATION 3-11-8, Sumiyoshi-cho Anjo, Aichi 446-8502 / JP | |||
04 /
Tomita, Shinichiro c/o MAKITA CORPORATION 3-11-8, Sumiyoshi-cho Anjo, Aichi 446-8502 / JP | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [2017/13] |
Former [2012/04] | Preuss, Udo Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11174831.5 | 21.07.2011 | [2012/04] | Priority number, date | JP20100164999 | 22.07.2010 Original published format: JP 2010164999 | [2012/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2409820 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2409820 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B24B55/05, B27B9/00, B27G19/04 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
B27B9/00 (EP,US);
B24B55/052 (EP,US);
B27G19/04 (EP,US);
Y10T83/2218 (EP,US);
Y10T83/96 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/04] | B27B9/00, B27G19/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/13] |
Former [2012/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Schneidewerkzeuge mit beweglichen Abdeckungsmontagestrukturen | [2012/04] | English: | Cutting tools having movable cover mounting structures | [2012/04] | French: | Outils de découpe dotés de structures de montage à couvercle amovible | [2012/04] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 02.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.07.2011 | AL | 29.03.2017 | AT | 29.03.2017 | CY | 29.03.2017 | CZ | 29.03.2017 | DK | 29.03.2017 | EE | 29.03.2017 | ES | 29.03.2017 | FI | 29.03.2017 | HR | 29.03.2017 | IT | 29.03.2017 | LT | 29.03.2017 | LV | 29.03.2017 | MC | 29.03.2017 | MK | 29.03.2017 | NL | 29.03.2017 | PL | 29.03.2017 | RO | 29.03.2017 | RS | 29.03.2017 | SE | 29.03.2017 | SI | 29.03.2017 | SK | 29.03.2017 | SM | 29.03.2017 | TR | 29.03.2017 | BG | 29.06.2017 | NO | 29.06.2017 | GR | 30.06.2017 | IE | 21.07.2017 | LU | 21.07.2017 | MT | 21.07.2017 | IS | 29.07.2017 | BE | 31.07.2017 | CH | 31.07.2017 | LI | 31.07.2017 | PT | 31.07.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 21.07.2011 | |
AT | 29.03.2017 | ||
CY | 29.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
MK | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
TR | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 21.07.2017 | ||
LU | 21.07.2017 | ||
MT | 21.07.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 21.07.2011 | |
AT | 29.03.2017 | ||
CY | 29.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
MK | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 21.07.2017 | ||
LU | 21.07.2017 | ||
MT | 21.07.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 21.07.2011 | |
AT | 29.03.2017 | ||
CY | 29.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 21.07.2017 | ||
LU | 21.07.2017 | ||
MT | 21.07.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 21.07.2011 | |
AT | 29.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 21.07.2017 | ||
LU | 21.07.2017 | ||
MT | 21.07.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 21.07.2017 | ||
LU | 21.07.2017 | ||
MT | 21.07.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 21.07.2017 | ||
LU | 21.07.2017 | ||
MT | 21.07.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 21.07.2017 | ||
LU | 21.07.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 21.07.2017 | ||
LU | 21.07.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 21.07.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 29.03.2017 | |
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3877148 (HUBER ROBERT H) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [X]DE3636601 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,6,9 * figure - *; | [A]US5411433 (KELLER ROBERT L [US]) [A] 1-12 * column 4, lines 38-55; figure - *; | [X]DE19719461 (ELECTROLUX AB [SE]) [X] 1-3,9 * column 8, line 52 - column 9, line 6; figures 2,9 *; | [A]DE19829190 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [X]US6389701 (FRIEDLAND LEONARD [US]) [X] 1-4 * column 4, lines 52-57; figures 7,9,15 * * column 7, lines 54-58 *; | [X]DE10124439 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,7,9 * abstract *; | [XI]DE102006022386 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0032] , [0033] , [0035] , [0040] , [0041]; figure - * [I] 10-12; | [X]US2009100885 (BOECK CORNELIUS [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0035]; figure - *; | [A]EP2098321 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [A] 1-12* paragraph [0014]; figure 11 * | by applicant | US6739060 | JP2010164999 |