EP2409585 - Chainsaw protective trousers or chaps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fletcher, Nigel Colin 116 Cavendish Road Hazel Grove Stockport Cheshire SK7 6JH / GB | For all designated states Fletcher, Ian L. 24 Copperfield Road Cheadle Hume Cheadle Cheshire SK8 7PN / GB | [2012/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/04] | Representative(s) | Cooke, Tracey, et al Novagraaf UK 5th Floor 145 Cannon Street London, EC4N 5BP / GB | [2012/17] |
Former [2012/04] | Harrison, Paul Richard Novagraaf London Parchment House 13 Northburgh Street London EC1V 0JP / GB | Application number, filing date | 11174947.9 | 21.07.2011 | [2012/04] | Priority number, date | GB20100012200 | 21.07.2010 Original published format: GB 201012200 | [2012/19] |
Former [2012/04] | GB20100012200 | 21.07.2010 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2409585 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2409585 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A41D13/05, A41D17/02, A41D1/06, A41D27/12 | [2012/41] | CPC: |
A41D1/067 (EP);
A41D13/0543 (EP);
A41D17/02 (EP);
A41D31/245 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/04] | A41D13/05, A41D17/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kettensägenschutzhosen oder -beinschützer | [2012/04] | English: | Chainsaw protective trousers or chaps | [2012/08] | French: | Pantalons et jambières de protection pour scie à chaîne | [2012/04] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/41] | 21.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2739759 (OCI SA [FR]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - line 6 * * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 3 * * page 4, line 17 - line 28 * * page 5, line 10 - line 13 * * page 5, line 24 - line 26 * * page 6, line 12 - line 14 * * page 7, line 17 - line 25 *; | [Y]US2008104743 (NG RAY [US]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0017] , [0018] , [0049] , [0051] , [0064] - [0066] - [0073] , [0091] , [0092] , [0097] , [0099] *; | [YD]US2004181859 (LEHMANN ROLF [DE]) [YD] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0015] , [0016] , [0040] - [0043] - [0047] *; | [Y]US2008098503 (SWARTZ JOHN A [US]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0018] , [0022] , [0027] , [0040] - [0043] *; | [A]US2010107293 (KOWAL TIMOTHY [US], et al) [A] 1-3,6-10 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0006] , [0017] , [0018] *; | [A]EP1728442 (HOTZ ECKHARD [DE]) [A] 4,11-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0011] - [0013] - [0016] , [0019] , [0022] , [0024] * | by applicant | US2004181859 |