Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9562276 | Global Dossier | 07.02.2017 | B2 | US2014154094 | 05.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US84427710 | 27.07.2010 | US201314105550 | 13.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8608877 | Global Dossier | 17.12.2013 | B2 | US2012027607 | 02.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US84427710 | 27.07.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2746240 | Global Dossier | 28.05.2019 | C | CA2746240 | 27.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US84427710 | 27.07.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2412833 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2018 | B1 | EP2412833 | 11.04.2012 | A3 | EP2412833 | 01.02.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US84427710 | 27.07.2010 |