EP2549846 - Tempering of the drive components of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/04] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bittner, Roland Grenzstraße 24 91522 Ansbach / DE | 02 /
Hösle, Markus Dresdener Str. 11 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2013/04] | Application number, filing date | 11175039.4 | 22.07.2011 | [2013/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2549846 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
B60L1/003 (EP);
B60L1/02 (EP);
B60L15/2045 (EP);
B60L58/26 (EP);
B60L58/27 (EP);
H05K7/20872 (EP);
H05K7/20945 (EP);
B60L2240/425 (EP);
B60L2240/525 (EP);
B60L2240/545 (EP);
Y02T10/64 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/72 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Temperieren der Antriebskomponenten eines Fahrzeugs | [2013/04] | English: | Tempering of the drive components of a vehicle | [2013/04] | French: | Ajustement des composants d'entraînement d'un véhicule | [2013/04] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/25] | 05.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/27] | 23.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP2392486 (TESLA MOTORS INC [US]) [E] 1-6,10 * the whole document * * paragraph [0021] *; | [I]EP2007184 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [I] 1,10 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0004] * * claims 3,4 *; | [A]EP1538885 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,10 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE602004012949T | DE202005009886U |