EP2388595 - Biomarkers for inflammation of the liver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schmiegel, Wolff Hevener Str. 56 44797 Bochum / DE | For all designated states Sipos, Bence Düppelstr. 46 24105 Kiel / DE | For all designated states Sitek, Barbara Im Röhrken 27 d 58456 Witten / DE | For all designated states Meyer, Helmut E. Franzstrasse 15 45661 Recklinghausen / DE | For all designated states Stühler, Kai Neusser Strasse 360 50733 Köln / DE | [2012/25] |
Former [2011/47] | For all designated states Schmiegel, Wolff Hevener Str. 56 44797 Bochum / DE | ||
For all designated states Sipos, Bence Düppelstr. 46 24105 Kiel / DE | |||
For all designated states Sitek, Barbara Riemker Strasse 59 44809 Bochum / DE | |||
For all designated states Meyer, Helmut E. Franzstrasse 15 45661 Recklinghausen / DE | |||
For all designated states Stühler, Kai Neusser Strasse 360 50733 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmiegel, Wolff Hevener Str. 56 44797 Bochum / DE | 02 /
Sipos, Bence Düppelstrasse 46 24105 Kiel / DE | 03 /
Sitek, Barbara Im Röhrken 27 d 58456 Witten / DE | 04 /
Meyer, Helmut E. Franzstrasse 15 45661 Recklinghausen / DE | 05 /
Stühler, Kai Neusser Strasse 360 50733 Köln / DE | 06 /
Klöppel, Günter Engasserbogen 18 80639 München / DE | [2012/25] |
Former [2011/47] | 01 /
Schmiegel, Wolff Hevener Str. 56 44797 Bochum / DE | ||
02 /
Sipos, Bence Düppelstrasse 46 24105 Kiel / DE | |||
03 /
Sitek, Barbara Riemker Str. 59 44809 Bochum / DE | |||
04 /
Meyer, Helmut E. Franzstrasse 15 45661 Recklinghausen / DE | |||
05 /
Stühler, Kai Neusser Strasse 360 50733 Köln / DE | |||
06 /
Klöppel, Günter Sternwartenweg 3a 24105 Kiel / DE | Representative(s) | Simandi, Claus Simandi Patentanwälte Kurfürstendamm 45 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/47] | Simandi, Claus Patentanwalt Höhenstrasse 26 53773 Hennef / Bonn / DE | Application number, filing date | 11175127.7 | 10.08.2007 | [2011/47] | Priority number, date | DE20061037613 | 10.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006037613 | DE20061048249 | 12.10.2006 Original published format: DE102006048249 | [2011/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2388595 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2388595 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68 | [2011/47] | CPC: |
G01N33/6893 (EP,CN,US);
G01N2800/085 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/47] | Title | German: | Biomarker für Leberentzündung | [2011/47] | English: | Biomarkers for inflammation of the liver | [2011/47] | French: | Biomarqueur d'hépatite | [2011/47] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/35] | 11.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/35] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07801230.9 / EP2052254 | Divisional application(s) | EP11187569.6 / EP2437064 | EP11187578.7 / EP2437065 | EP11187588.6 / EP2437066 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003152923 (YAKHINI ZOHAR [IL], et al) [X] 15 * abstract ** Insbesondere: Anspruch 10. *; | [X]US2005136489 (TSENG TZU-LING [TW], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * * Insbesondere: paragraphs 40-65; Table 2; Ansrpüche 1-22 *; | [X]WO2006019037 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * * Insbesondere: Seite 10; Tabellen2-5, 7, 8, 10 und 12. *; | [A] - GOURLEY GLENN R ET AL, "Proteomics to predict hepatitis C fibrosis.", HEPATOLOGY, & 54TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE STUDY OF LIVER DISEASES; BOSTON, MA, USA; OCTOBER 24-28, 2003, (200310), vol. 38, no. 4 Suppl. 1, ISSN 0270-9139, pages 442A - 443A, XP002468813 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - BLANC JEAN-FRÉDÉRIC ET AL, "Proteomic analysis of differentially expressed proteins in hepatocellular carcinoma developed in patients with chronic viral hepatitis C.", PROTEOMICS SEP 2005, (200509), vol. 5, no. 14, ISSN 1615-9853, pages 3778 - 3789, XP002468814 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * * Insbesondere: S. 3778, abstract; S3779-3780, Absätze 2.1, 2.4 und 2.6; Abbildungen 1-3; Tabellen 1-3. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pmic.200401194 | [A] - SHACKEL N A ET AL, "Novel differential gene expression in human cirrhosis detected by suppression subtractive hybridization", HEPATOLOGY, WILLIAMS AND WILKINS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (200309), vol. 38, no. 3, ISSN 0270-9139, pages 577 - 588, XP002357884 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * * Insbesondere: Abstract; S. 578, Spalte 1, letzter Absatz; Tabellen 1-6. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/jhep.2003.50376 | [A] - SMITH M W ET AL, "Hepatitis C virus and liver disease: Global transcriptional profiling and identification of potential markers", HEPATOLOGY, WILLIAMS AND WILKINS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (200312), vol. 38, no. 6, ISSN 0270-9139, pages 1458 - 1467, XP002994989 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * * Insbesondere: Abstract; S. 1459, Spalte 1-2, überbrückender Absatz; S. 1460, Spalte 1, Absatz 2 - Spalte 2, Absatz 1; S. 1461, Spalte 1, Absatz 2 - S. 1462, Spalte 1, erster Absatz; Alle Abbildungen. * | [A] - SHACKEL N A ET AL, "INSIGHTS INTO THE PATHOBIOLOGY OF HEPATITIS C VIRUS-ASSOCIATED CIRRHOSIS ANALYSIS OF INTRAHEPATIC DIFFERENTIAL GENE EXPRESSION", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (200202), vol. 160, no. 2, ISSN 0002-9440, pages 641 - 654, XP001176854 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * * Insbesondere: Abstract; S. 642, Spalte 1, Absatz 1; S. 643, Spalte 2, letzter Absatz - S. 645, Spalte 2, Absatz 2; Abbildungen 2-5; Tabelle 1; S. 648-652, Discussion. * | by applicant | - T. POYNARD ET AL., EXPERT REV MOL DIAGN., (2005), vol. 5, no. 1, pages 15 - 21 | - V. LEROY ET AL., J HEP, (2001), vol. 35, no. 1, page 26 | - Pschyrembel, Klinisches Wörterbuch, (2004), vol. 260 |