EP2412592 - Electric hydraulic booster [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Wernerstrasse 1 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2012/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klimes, Milan 802 Topinabee Rd. Niles, MI Michigan 49120 / US | [2012/05] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/05] | Barth, Stephan Manuel Isarpatent Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11175185.5 | 25.07.2011 | [2012/05] | Priority number, date | US20100845151 | 28.07.2010 Original published format: US 845151 | [2012/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2412592 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2412592 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/14, B60T13/68 | [2012/05] | CPC: |
B60T13/686 (EP,US);
B60T13/143 (EP,US);
B60T13/147 (EP,US);
B60T8/4077 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Title | German: | Elektrischer hydraulischer Bremskraftverstärker | [2012/05] | English: | Electric hydraulic booster | [2012/05] | French: | Servofrein hydraulique électrique | [2012/05] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/37] | 13.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.07.2011 | AL | 03.07.2013 | AT | 03.07.2013 | BE | 03.07.2013 | BG | 03.07.2013 | CY | 03.07.2013 | CZ | 03.07.2013 | DK | 03.07.2013 | EE | 03.07.2013 | FI | 03.07.2013 | HR | 03.07.2013 | LT | 03.07.2013 | LV | 03.07.2013 | MC | 03.07.2013 | MK | 03.07.2013 | MT | 03.07.2013 | NL | 03.07.2013 | PL | 03.07.2013 | RO | 03.07.2013 | SE | 03.07.2013 | SI | 03.07.2013 | SK | 03.07.2013 | SM | 03.07.2013 | TR | 03.07.2013 | IE | 25.07.2013 | LU | 25.07.2013 | NO | 03.10.2013 | RS | 03.10.2013 | GR | 04.10.2013 | IS | 03.11.2013 | PT | 04.11.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 25.07.2011 | |
AT | 03.07.2013 | ||
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
MK | 03.07.2013 | ||
MT | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
SM | 03.07.2013 | ||
TR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IE | 25.07.2013 | ||
LU | 25.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
RS | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
MK | 03.07.2013 | ||
MT | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
SM | 03.07.2013 | ||
TR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IE | 25.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
SM | 03.07.2013 | ||
IE | 25.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
IE | 25.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
DK | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
MC | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
FI | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 03.07.2013 | |
BE | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
SE | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 03.07.2013 | |
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | SI | 03.07.2013 | |
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | SI | 03.07.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19703776 (ITT MFG ENTERPRISES INC [US]) [X] 1-8 * figure 4 * |