EP2413002 - Motorcycle fork assembly with adjustment system of compensating spring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tenneco Marzocchi S.r.l. Via Grazia 2 40069 Zola Predosa (BO) / IT | [2012/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pezzi, Enrico Via San Mauro, 1480 47023 CESENA (FC) / IT | 02 /
Bolognini, Federico Via Napoli, 7 40100 BOLOGNA (BO) / IT | 03 /
Frontali, Francesco Via Ettore Nardi, 8 40064 OZZANO DELL'EMILIA (BO) / IT | 04 /
Olivieri, Gianluca Via Rio D'Orzo, 271 41056 SAVIGNANO SUL PANARO (MO) / IT | [2012/05] | Representative(s) | Cutropia, Gianluigi Ing. Claudio Baldi s.r.l. Viale Cavallotti, 13 60035 Jesi (AN) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/05] | Cutropia, Gianluigi Ing. Claudio Baldi s.r.l. Viale Cavallotti, 13 60035 Jesi (AN) / IT | Application number, filing date | 11175186.3 | 25.07.2011 | [2012/05] | Priority number, date | IT2010AN00125 | 26.07.2010 Original published format: IT AN20100125 | [2012/05] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2413002 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/06, F16F9/46 | [2012/05] | CPC: |
F16F9/067 (EP);
F16F9/062 (EP);
F16F9/461 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Motorradgabelanordnung mit Einstellsystem für Ausgleichsfeder | [2012/05] | English: | Motorcycle fork assembly with adjustment system of compensating spring | [2012/05] | French: | Ensemble formant fourche de motocyclette doté d'un système de compensation du ressort | [2012/05] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/04] | 07.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008230335 (FURUYA KEN [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * par. 31-33; Fig.1, pos.27,28; paragraphs [0007] - [0047]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4807860 (SIMONS STEPHEN W [US]) [A] 1-5 * Fig.8; column 1, line 19 - column 6, line 65; figure -; claim - *; | [A]JPH11280826 (SHOWA CORP) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * |