EP2428835 - Method for producing cost-optimised spectacle lenses with particularly advantageous characteristics for the user [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Opto Tech Optikmaschinen GmbH Sandusweg 2-4 35435 Wettenberg / DE | [2012/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mandler, Roland OptoTech Optikmaschinen GmbH Berkenhoffstraße 2a 35452 Heuchelheim / DE | [2012/11] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft mbB Neue Mainzer Straße 75 60311 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/43] | Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft Bettinastrasse 53-55 60325 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [2012/11] | Buchhold, Jürgen Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft Bettinastrasse 53-55 60325 Frankfurt/Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 11175246.5 | 25.07.2011 | [2012/11] | Priority number, date | DE20101037400 | 08.09.2010 Original published format: DE102010037400 | [2012/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2428835 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G02C7/06, G02C7/02 | [2012/11] | CPC: |
G02C7/024 (EP,US);
G02C7/02 (EP,US);
G02C7/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von kostenoptimierten Brillengläsern mit besonders verteilhaften Eigenschaften für den Nutzer | [2012/11] | English: | Method for producing cost-optimised spectacle lenses with particularly advantageous characteristics for the user | [2012/11] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de verres pour lunettes au meilleur coût avec des caractéristiques particulièrement avantageuses pour l'utilisateur | [2012/11] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 01.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/27] | 28.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US1942400 (GLANCY ANNA E) [I] 1-13 * page 1, line 86 - page 3, line 84; figures I-IX *; | [I]WO9721136 (OAKLEY INC [US]) [I] 1-13 * page 3, line 24 - page 15, line 10; figures 1-12a *; | [XI]EP0857993 (ZEISS CARL [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,6-10,13 * page 3, line 3 - line 57 * * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 56; figures 1-4b; example 1 * [I] 3-5,11,12; | [IP]EP2253990 (POLYLITE TAIWAN CO LTD [TW]) [IP] 1-13* paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0048]; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | DE1115609 | DE1422125 | US4484804 | EP0744646 | DE19701312 | DE10103113 | EP1990676 |