EP2416230 - Computer system with power saving function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASUSTeK Computer Inc. No. 15, Lide Road Beitou District Taipei City 112 / TW | [2012/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tung, Po-Jun c/o No. 15, Lide Rd. Beitou Dist. Taipei City 112 / TW | 02 /
Liu, Fu-Hsiang c/o No. 15, Lide Rd. Beitou Dist. Taipei City 112 / TW | [2012/15] |
Former [2012/06] | 01 /
Tung, Po-Jun c/o No. 15, Lide Rd. Beitou Dist. Taipei City 112 / TW | ||
02 /
Liu, Fu-Hsiang c/o No. 15, Lide Rd. Beitou Dist. Taipei City 112 / TW | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/43] | Becker & Kurig Partnerschaft Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/06] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11175771.2 | 28.07.2011 | [2012/06] | Priority number, date | TW20100125996 | 04.08.2010 Original published format: TW 99125996 | [2012/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2416230 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2416230 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2416230 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/3203, G06F1/3293, G06F1/32, G06F3/14, G09G5/393, G09G5/395, G09G5/36 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
G06F1/3203 (EP,US);
G06F1/3293 (EP,US);
G06F3/14 (EP,US);
G09G2330/021 (EP,US);
G09G2360/18 (EP,US);
G09G2380/14 (EP,US);
G09G5/36 (EP,US);
G09G5/393 (EP,US);
G09G5/395 (EP,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/33] | G06F1/32, G06F3/14, G09G5/393, G09G5/395, G09G5/36 | ||
Former IPC [2012/06] | G06F1/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] |
Former [2012/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Computersystem mit Stromsparfunktion | [2012/06] | English: | Computer system with power saving function | [2012/06] | French: | Système informatique doté d'une fonction d'économie d'énergie | [2012/06] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/09] | 23.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 03.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.01.2018 | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.07.2011 | AL | 27.10.2021 | AT | 27.10.2021 | CY | 27.10.2021 | CZ | 27.10.2021 | DK | 27.10.2021 | EE | 27.10.2021 | ES | 27.10.2021 | FI | 27.10.2021 | HR | 27.10.2021 | IT | 27.10.2021 | LT | 27.10.2021 | LV | 27.10.2021 | MC | 27.10.2021 | MK | 27.10.2021 | MT | 27.10.2021 | NL | 27.10.2021 | PL | 27.10.2021 | RO | 27.10.2021 | RS | 27.10.2021 | SE | 27.10.2021 | SI | 27.10.2021 | SK | 27.10.2021 | SM | 27.10.2021 | TR | 27.10.2021 | BG | 27.01.2022 | NO | 27.01.2022 | GR | 28.01.2022 | IS | 27.02.2022 | PT | 28.02.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 28.07.2011 | |
AL | 27.10.2021 | ||
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CY | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
IT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
MK | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
TR | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 28.07.2011 | |
AL | 27.10.2021 | ||
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CY | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
IT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
MK | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 28.07.2011 | |
AL | 27.10.2021 | ||
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CY | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
IT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 28.07.2011 | |
AL | 27.10.2021 | ||
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
IT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
IT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 27.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1594047 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4-9 * columns 16-32, 4; figures 1-7; claims 1, 14-17 * [I] 3; | [XI]US7117379 (HAMILTON TONY G [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0041] - [0050] - [0 59] - [0068]; figures 2, 5, 6; claims 1-3, 12, 13 * [I] 4-9; | [XI]US2007268200 (FULLER ANDREW J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-9 * paragraphs [0003] , [0 15] - [0029] - [0 34] - [0047]; figures 1, 2, 4, 5 * [I] 3; | [XI]US2009240967 (GOOD GARY G [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0009] , [0 10] , [0 31] , [0 38] - [0056] - [0 61] , [0 65]; figures 2B, 3, 4B, 7, 8 * [I] 9; | [A]US2010023788 (SCOTT JAMES W [GB], et al) [A] 1,3* paragraphs [0258] , [0 54] * |