EP2550945 - Tampon with a cavity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marlafin AG Frauentalstrasse 3 6332 Hagendorn / CH | [2013/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hammen, Axel Bodenstrasse 4A 5426 Lengnau / CH | 02 /
Lopez, Odilo Haldenwiesli 3 8224 Löhningen / CH | [2013/05] | Representative(s) | AMMANN PATENTANWÄLTE AG Schwarztorstrasse 31 3001 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/05] | AMMANN PATENTANWÄLTE AG BERN Schwarztorstrasse 31 3001 Bern / CH | Application number, filing date | 11175780.3 | 28.07.2011 | [2013/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2550945 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/20, A61F13/34, A61K9/00, A61H21/00 | [2013/05] | CPC: |
A61F13/2042 (EP,US);
A61F13/2051 (EP,US);
A61F13/2074 (EP,US);
A61F13/34 (EP,US);
A61K9/0036 (EP,US);
A61H19/44 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Tampon mit einem Hohlraum | [2013/05] | English: | Tampon with a cavity | [2013/05] | French: | Tampon doté d'un espace creux | [2013/05] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/04] | 05.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2007260210 (CONROY DAVID [US]) [AD] 1-16 * paragraphs [0036] - [0044]; figure - *; | [A]EP0415087 (SCHICKEDANZ VER PAPIERWERK [DE]) [A] 1-16 * column 2, line 5 - column 6, line 17; figure - *; | [A]US6036666 (PEILER FRANCES K [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 6, line 25 - column 10, line 15; figure - * | by applicant | US5782779 | US6183428 | US2007260210 |