12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
19.06.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
11.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] |
28.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
07.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
10.01.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] |
08.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
01.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
18.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
27.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |
20.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] |
06.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] |
16.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] |
09.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
02.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
26.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
01.02.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] |
22.01.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
22.01.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.09.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.09.2012 |
Change - English title |
published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] |
24.08.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] |
24.08.2012 |
Change - German title |
published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] |
24.08.2012 |
Change - French title |
published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] |
13.07.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |
01.02.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] |