12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
13.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
27.03.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] |
05.09.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] |
15.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] |
25.07.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.08.2014 [2014/35] |
06.06.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] |
09.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
02.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] |
25.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] |
28.03.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] |
14.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] |
31.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
17.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
10.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] |
16.08.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] |
09.08.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.08.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
07.08.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.04.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.03.2013 |
Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.07.2012 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.07.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.07.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] |
08.02.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.02.2012 [2012/06] |