EP2555382 - Permanent magnet assembly and method for fixing a permanent magnet onto a base plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2013/06] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Urda, Adriana Cristina Munkebjervaenget 11E, leijl. 6, 2sal 5230 Odense M / DK | 02 /
Valbjoern, Jesper Brynet 17, Bramdrupdam 6000 Kolding / DK | [2013/06] | Application number, filing date | 11176141.7 | 01.08.2011 | [2013/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2555382 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/27, H02K15/03 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
H02K1/2781 (EP,US);
H02K15/03 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Dauermagnetanordnung und Verfahren zur Befestigung eines Dauermagneten auf einer Grundplatte | [2013/06] | English: | Permanent magnet assembly and method for fixing a permanent magnet onto a base plate | [2013/06] | French: | Ensemble formant aimant permanent et procédé pour fixer un aimant permanent sur une plaque de base | [2013/06] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/06] | 12.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1263267 (D B A DIVISION DUCELLIER) [X] 15 * column 1, line 21 - column 2, line 15; figure 1 *; | [XYI]EP1860755 (CONVERTEAM LTD [GB]) [X] 1,3,8,13,14 * paragraphs [0013] , [0016] - [0018]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 2,4,6,9,14 [I] 5,10,11; | [Y]US2010231085 (IFRIM COSTIN [US], et al) [Y] 2 * claim 13 *; | [Y]EP2348619 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 4,6,9,14* paragraph [0044]; figures 3,4 * |