blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2474906

EP2474906 - Network device management system, network device management apparatus, client apparatus, and network device management method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  21.02.2014
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2014Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 26.03.2014  [2014/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2012/28]For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ohashi, Toshio
c/o Canon Kabushi Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
 [2012/28]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2012/28]
Application number, filing date11176237.302.08.2011
[2012/28]
Priority number, dateJP2010019714702.09.2010         Original published format: JP 2010197147
[2012/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2474906
Date:11.07.2012
Language:EN
[2012/28]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2474906
Date:19.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.08.2012
ClassificationIPC:G06F9/445
[2012/28]
CPC:
H04L41/22 (EP,US); G06F8/61 (EP,US); H04L41/0853 (EP,US);
H04L41/0806 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/28]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Netzwerkvorrichtungsverwaltungssystem, Netzwerkvorrichtungsverwaltungsgerät, Client-Vorrichtung und Netzwerkvorrichtungsverwaltungsverfahren[2012/28]
English:Network device management system, network device management apparatus, client apparatus, and network device management method[2012/28]
French:Système de gestion de dispositif de réseau, appareil de gestion de dispositif de réseau, appareil de client et procédé de gestion de dispositif de réseau[2012/28]
Examination procedure04.01.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.03.2013Examination requested  [2013/17]
18.02.2014Application withdrawn by applicant  [2014/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[I]  - OTTO R ET AL, "CERN printing infrastructure", JOURNAL OF PHYSICS: CONFERENCE SERIES, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, GB, (20080701), vol. 119, no. 8, ISSN 1742-6596, page 82009, XP020139637 [I] 1-3,9 * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line l *
 [A]  - Anonymous, "Foomatic from the Developer's View: How does Foomatic work?", (20021231), pages 4PP,1 - 20, Linux Printing Tutorial at Linux Kongress, URL: http://www.openprinting.org/download/kpfeifle/LinuxKongress2002/Tutorial/IV.Foomatic-Developer/IV.Foomatic-Developer.pdf, (20120723), XP002680538 [A] 1-3,9 * page 8, line 1 - page 9, line l *
by applicantJP2007109213
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.