EP2420168 - Fryer fitted with means for filtering and purifying oil and a method carried out through said means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inoxpiu S.r.l. Via Provina 18 Z.I. Ravina 38040 Trento / IT | [2012/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zuccatti, Andrea c/o INOXPIU S.r.l. Via Provina, 18 Z.I. Ravina 38040 Trento / IT | [2012/49] |
Former [2012/08] | 01 /
Zuccatti, Andrea INOXPIU S.R.L. Via Provina, 18 - Z.I. Ravina 38040 Trento / IT | Representative(s) | Sandri, Sandro Bugnion S.P.A. Via Pancaldo 68 37138 Verona / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | Sandri, Sandro Europatent-Euromark Srl Via Locatelli, 20 37122 Verona / IT | Application number, filing date | 11176756.2 | 05.08.2011 | [2012/08] | Priority number, date | IT2010VR00167 | 06.08.2010 Original published format: IT VR20100167 | [2012/08] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2420168 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/12 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
A47J37/1223 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fritiergerät mit Mitteln zum Filtrieren und Reinigen des Öls und durch diese Mittel durchgeführtes Verfahren | [2012/08] | English: | Fryer fitted with means for filtering and purifying oil and a method carried out through said means | [2012/08] | French: | Friteuse avec moyens de filtration et purification de l'huile et méthode effectuée par ces moyens | [2012/08] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/35] | 09.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/37] | 25.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.11.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]GB2427154 (YAXLEY ADAM [GB]) [Y] 1,4,9 * page 6, lines 8-21 * * page 7, lines 2-25 * * page 8, lines 2-4 * * figure 2 * [A] 2; | [YA]US2005223909 (KURATA KATSUHIKO [JP]) [Y] 1,4,9 * paragraphs [0018] - [0020] - [0 27] - [0029]; figures 1-2 * [A] 3; | [A]US2007062515 (MULLANEY ALFRED E JR [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,6-8,10 * paragraphs [0014] , [0 15] , [0 19] - [0022] - [0 24]; figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US5782164 (BRINTLE B KELLY [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 66 - column 6, line 30 * * page 6, line 65 - column 7, line 9 * * claims 1, 3, 7 * * figures 7, 8, 14-16 *; | [A]WO2009014562 (FRYMASTER LLC [US], et al) [A] 10 * page 5, line 1 - page 7, line 20; figures 1, 2, 5 * |