EP2388959 - System and method for uplink timing synchronization in conjunction with discontinuous reception [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2013/48] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo ON N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2011/47] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Womack, James 32 Linderhof Circle Bedford, TX Texas 76022 / US | 02 /
Cai, Zhijun 3009 Manor Green Blvd. Euless, TX Texas 76039-4138 / US | [2011/47] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/47] | Finnie, Peter John Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 11177135.8 | 31.03.2008 | [2011/47] | Priority number, date | US20080052539 | 20.03.2008 Original published format: US 52539 | [2011/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2388959 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2388959 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/00, H04W74/00, // H04L5/00 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
H04W56/0005 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04L5/0094 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,KR,US);
H04L27/2662 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04L5/0016 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/003 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0048 (EP,KR,US);
H04W48/08 (EP,BR,US);
H04W52/0216 (EP,BR,US);
H04W52/0225 (EP,BR,US);
H04W72/04 (BR,US);
H04W72/20 (BR,KR);
H04W72/21 (BR,US);
H04W76/28 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04W84/042 (EP,KR,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/47] | H04L12/28, H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/26] |
Former [2011/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Uplink-Zeitpunktsynchronisation in Zusammenhang mit dem nicht kontinuierlichen Empfang | [2011/47] | English: | System and method for uplink timing synchronization in conjunction with discontinuous reception | [2011/47] | French: | Système et procédé de synchronisation temporelle de liaison montante en conjonction avec une réception discontinue | [2011/47] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/27] | 20.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08153883.7 / EP2104276 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080153883) is 11.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.03.2008 | AT | 24.06.2015 | BE | 24.06.2015 | CY | 24.06.2015 | CZ | 24.06.2015 | DK | 24.06.2015 | EE | 24.06.2015 | HR | 24.06.2015 | IT | 24.06.2015 | LT | 24.06.2015 | LV | 24.06.2015 | MC | 24.06.2015 | MT | 24.06.2015 | PL | 24.06.2015 | RO | 24.06.2015 | SI | 24.06.2015 | SK | 24.06.2015 | TR | 24.06.2015 | BG | 24.09.2015 | NO | 24.09.2015 | GR | 25.09.2015 | IS | 24.10.2015 | PT | 26.10.2015 | [2018/33] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 31.03.2008 | |
AT | 24.06.2015 | ||
BE | 24.06.2015 | ||
CY | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
MT | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
BE | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
MT | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
BE | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 24.06.2015 | |
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 24.06.2015 | |
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | HR | 24.06.2015 | |
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | HR | 24.06.2015 | |
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1816883 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10 * column 1, paragraph 2 - column 7, paragraph 34 * * column 15, paragraph 93 - column 19, paragraph 112 * * column 24, paragraph 139 - column 25, paragraph 145 * * figures 1-6,10 *; | [X] - TEXAS INSTRUMENTS, "Scheduling Request and DRX", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-071472_SR, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070403), vol. RAN WG1, no. St. Julian; 20070403, XP050105407 [X] 1-10 * page 1, section "1. Introduction" * * page 1, section "2. Scheduling request in DRX mode" * * page 2, section "3. UL synchronization maintenance of DRX UEs" * * figures 1-4 * | [A] - TEXAS INSTRUMENTS, "Sounding Reference Signal In Support of Scheduling Request in E-UTRA", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-080700_SRSRS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080206), vol. RAN WG1, no. Sorrento, Italy; 20080206, XP050109194 [A] 1-10 * page 1, section "1. Introduction" * * page 2, section "2. Scheduling Request Sounding Reference Signal (SR-SRS)" * * page 4, section "3. UE behaviour" * * figures 1-8 * | [A] - RESEARCH IN MOTION, "SRS Transmission Support in DRX Mode", Sorrento, Italy, (20080211), pages 1 - 2, TSG-RAN WG2 #61, R2-080808, URL: http://isearch.etsi.org/3GPPSearch/isysquery/71d006b6-1013-48b7-a0a9-6ff1128f095b/17/doc/, (20080605), XP002483090 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |