EP2420358 - Power Tool with Light Emitting Assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black & Decker Inc. 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | [2012/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Osborne, Stephen, P. 3732 Parkfield Road Pikesville, MD Maryland 21208 / US | 02 /
Dixon, Eva, J 10305 College Square Columbia, MD Maryland 21044 / US | 03 /
Hatfield, Eric E. 206 Creekwood Drive Jacobs, PA Pennsylvania 17407 / US | 04 /
Krout, Daniel L. 2 Adams Court New Freedom, PA Pennsylvania 17349 / US | 05 /
Robertson, Corey, G 1249 Felton Road Felton, PA Pennsylvania 17322 / US | 06 /
Friedman, Brian E. 2113 Bank Street Baltimore, MD Maryland 21231 / US | [2012/08] | Representative(s) | SBD IPAdmin 270 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 4DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | Application number, filing date | 11177720.7 | 16.08.2011 | [2012/08] | Priority number, date | US20100859036 | 18.08.2010 Original published format: US 859036 | [2012/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2420358 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2420358 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B25F5/02, B25B23/18 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
B25B21/00 (EP,US);
F21V33/0084 (US);
B23B45/003 (US);
B25B23/18 (EP,US);
B25F5/021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektrowerkzeug mit lichtemittierender Anordnung | [2012/08] | English: | Power Tool with Light Emitting Assembly | [2012/08] | French: | Outil électrique doté d'un ensemble électroluminescent | [2012/08] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/44] | 14.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP1072842 (MAKITA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,7,9,14,16 * pages 2,3; figure - * [Y] 6,8,10 [I] 4,15,17; | [Y]US2002172035 (HARA AKIHITO [JP], et al) [Y] 5,6,10 * pages 3,4; figure - *; | [XYI]EP1477282 (HITACHI KOKI KK [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,7,9-14,16 * paragraphs [0081] - [0098]; figure - * [Y] 6,8,17 [I] 4; | [XYI]US2008074865 (LUTZ MANFRED [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,7,9-14,16 * paragraphs [0009] - [0026] - [0042] - [0046]; figure - * [Y] 5,6,8,17 [I] 4,15; | [A]JP2009083030 (HITACHI KOKI KK) [A] 1-17 * abstract *; | [Y]EP2070659 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [Y] 8,17 * paragraphs [0036] - [0042]; figure - *; | [A]DE102007061741 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-17* paragraphs [0030] - [0041]; figure - * | by applicant | US7066691 | US20090394426 |