EP2420165 - Multifunctional highchair and conversion process for the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/08] | Adjusting mechanism | ||
[2013/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolef, David Kaiserstr. 210 47800 Krefeld / DE | [2012/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/08] | Representative(s) | Bals, Rüdiger, et al Bals & Vogel Universitätsstraße 142 DE-44799 Bochum / DE | [2012/08] | Application number, filing date | 11178008.6 | 18.08.2011 | [2012/08] | Priority number, date | DE20101037056 | 18.08.2010 Original published format: DE102010037056 | [2012/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2420165 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2420165 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | [2012/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2420165 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A47D1/08, A47D1/00 | [2012/10] | CPC: |
A47D1/08 (EP,US);
A47D1/004 (EP);
A47D1/0085 (EP,US);
A47D1/06 (EP);
A47D1/10 (EP);
A47D13/102 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/08] | Title | German: | Multifunktioneller Kinderhochstuhl und dessen Umwandlungsverfahren | [2013/49] | English: | Multifunctional highchair and conversion process for the same | [2013/49] | French: | Chaise haute multifunctionelle et son procédé de conversion | [2013/49] |
Former [2012/08] | Verstellmechanismus | ||
Former [2012/08] | Adjusting mechanism | ||
Former [2012/08] | Mécanisme de réglage | Examination procedure | 07.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/42] | 27.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.11.2013 | 12.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.12.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 22.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12160319.5 / EP2468144 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.08.2011 | AL | 04.06.2014 | BG | 04.06.2014 | CY | 04.06.2014 | CZ | 04.06.2014 | DK | 04.06.2014 | EE | 04.06.2014 | ES | 04.06.2014 | FI | 04.06.2014 | HR | 04.06.2014 | IT | 04.06.2014 | LT | 04.06.2014 | LV | 04.06.2014 | MC | 04.06.2014 | MK | 04.06.2014 | MT | 04.06.2014 | NL | 04.06.2014 | PL | 04.06.2014 | RO | 04.06.2014 | RS | 04.06.2014 | SE | 04.06.2014 | SI | 04.06.2014 | SK | 04.06.2014 | SM | 04.06.2014 | TR | 04.06.2014 | IE | 18.08.2014 | LU | 18.08.2014 | NO | 04.09.2014 | GR | 05.09.2014 | IS | 04.10.2014 | PT | 06.10.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 18.08.2011 | |
BG | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
MK | 04.06.2014 | ||
MT | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
SM | 04.06.2014 | ||
TR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IE | 18.08.2014 | ||
LU | 18.08.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 18.08.2011 | |
BG | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
MT | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
SM | 04.06.2014 | ||
TR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IE | 18.08.2014 | ||
LU | 18.08.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 18.08.2011 | |
BG | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
MT | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
SM | 04.06.2014 | ||
IE | 18.08.2014 | ||
LU | 18.08.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
MT | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
SM | 04.06.2014 | ||
IE | 18.08.2014 | ||
LU | 18.08.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
SM | 04.06.2014 | ||
IE | 18.08.2014 | ||
LU | 18.08.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
IE | 18.08.2014 | ||
LU | 18.08.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
LU | 18.08.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
LU | 18.08.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
LU | 18.08.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 04.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US604941 (PAINE) [X] 1-3,13 * page 1, column 2; figure - *; | [A]DE9102521U (SCHLECHT) [A] 1* figure - * | Examination | GB646684 | by applicant | GB646684 | US5531502 |