|
06.02.2025 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2025 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2025 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2025 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2025 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.01.2025 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.01.2025 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2024 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.10.2024 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.10.2024 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.10.2024 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
72 |
|
10.07.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
72 |
|
10.07.2024 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2024 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
65 |
|
10.07.2024 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.07.2024 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.07.2024 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.07.2024 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.02.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.02.2024 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.2024 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.11.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.11.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2023 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.09.2023 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.09.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.09.2023 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.09.2023 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.02.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.01.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2023 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
34 |
|
31.01.2023 |
Clean copy of description pages in the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
31.01.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2023 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2022 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.10.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.10.2022 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.10.2022 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2022 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
24.08.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.08.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.08.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.08.2022 |
F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.02.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2022 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2022 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.01.2022 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.01.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.01.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2022 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.01.2022 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.01.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2022 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2022 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.01.2022 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.01.2022 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
23.12.2021 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.12.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2021 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.12.2021 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.12.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.11.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.06.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.06.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.04.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.04.2021 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2020 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2020 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2020 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2018 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
25.09.2017 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2017 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
41 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
34 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
25 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
54 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
70 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
42 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
23 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
38 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
87 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
57 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
78 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
31 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
27 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
47 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
07.08.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.07.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.07.2017 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.07.2017 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.07.2017 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.07.2017 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.07.2017 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
OPPODREX with handwritten amendments |
Opposition |
48 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
17.01.2017 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
38 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.12.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.11.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.06.2016 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.06.2016 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.06.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2016 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2016 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.02.2016 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
12.10.2015 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2015 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2015 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
42 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
41 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
87 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
54 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
70 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
47 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
78 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
57 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
10.02.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2014 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2014 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2014 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.10.2014 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.10.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.07.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
68 |
|
11.07.2014 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.06.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.06.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.06.2014 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2014 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.02.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
68 |
|
14.01.2014 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.08.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.08.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.04.2013 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2013 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.04.2013 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
03.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
26.02.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.02.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2013 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
68 |
|
23.10.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.10.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
23.10.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.10.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.10.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.10.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.10.2012 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2012 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2012 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.05.2012 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2012 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.05.2012 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.04.2012 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.02.2012 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2011 |
Request for correction of obvious mistakes allowed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2011 |
Request for correction of errors in filed documents |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2011 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2011 |
Request for correction of errors in filed documents |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2011 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2011 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.08.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
19.08.2011 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2011 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
19.08.2011 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
87 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
25 |