EP2478961 - Universal closing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STIWA Holding GmbH Salzburger Strasse 52 4800 Attnang-Puchheim / AT | [2012/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heiml, Roland Fornacherstraße 6 4870 Vöcklamarkt / AT | [2012/30] | Representative(s) | Burger, Hannes Anwälte Burger & Partner Rechtsanwalt GmbH Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | [2015/15] |
Former [2012/30] | Burger, Hannes Anwälte Burger & Partner Rechtsanwalt GmbH Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | Application number, filing date | 11178384.1 | 23.08.2011 | [2012/30] | Priority number, date | DE20111000216 | 19.01.2011 Original published format: DE102011000216 | [2012/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2478961 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2478961 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, B65D39/04, B65D39/00 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
B01L3/50825 (EP,KR,US);
B65D39/0052 (US);
B65D39/04 (EP,US);
B01L2200/023 (EP,US);
B65D2539/003 (EP,US);
B65D2539/005 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/30] | B01L3/14, B65D39/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/30] | Title | German: | Universelle Verschlussvorrichtung | [2012/30] | English: | Universal closing device | [2012/30] | French: | Dispositif de fermeture universel | [2012/30] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 13.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | 11.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.08.2011 | AL | 08.04.2015 | BG | 08.04.2015 | CY | 08.04.2015 | CZ | 08.04.2015 | DK | 08.04.2015 | EE | 08.04.2015 | FI | 08.04.2015 | HR | 08.04.2015 | LT | 08.04.2015 | LV | 08.04.2015 | MC | 08.04.2015 | MK | 08.04.2015 | MT | 08.04.2015 | PL | 08.04.2015 | RO | 08.04.2015 | RS | 08.04.2015 | SE | 08.04.2015 | SI | 08.04.2015 | SK | 08.04.2015 | SM | 08.04.2015 | NO | 08.07.2015 | GR | 09.07.2015 | IS | 08.08.2015 | PT | 10.08.2015 | IE | 23.08.2015 | LU | 23.08.2015 | BE | 31.08.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 23.08.2011 | |
BG | 08.04.2015 | ||
CY | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
MK | 08.04.2015 | ||
MT | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
SE | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
SM | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
IE | 23.08.2015 | ||
LU | 23.08.2015 | ||
BE | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 23.08.2011 | |
BG | 08.04.2015 | ||
CY | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
MT | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
SE | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
SM | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
IE | 23.08.2015 | ||
LU | 23.08.2015 | ||
BE | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | CZ | 08.04.2015 | |
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
MT | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
IE | 23.08.2015 | ||
LU | 23.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 08.04.2015 | |
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
IE | 23.08.2015 | ||
LU | 23.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 08.04.2015 | |
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
LU | 23.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | CZ | 08.04.2015 | |
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
LU | 23.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/17] | CZ | 08.04.2015 | |
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
LU | 23.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 08.04.2015 | |
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | DK | 08.04.2015 | |
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | DK | 08.04.2015 | |
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 08.04.2015 | |
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 08.04.2015 | |
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB763212 (HERBERT BRUENE) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3915268 (REHAU AG) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US2004115096 (ITOH TERUAKI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2007068011 (STICHT FERTIGUNGSTECH STIWA [AT], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE958989 | CH320255 | GB943533 | GB1111656 | DE3108225 | US4553567 | DE3939092 | GB2278112 | DE4417998 | WO9821109 | WO2007068011 |