EP2426278 - Working machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kobelco Construction Machinery Co. Ltd. 12-4, Gion 3-chome Asaminami-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-0138 / JP | [2012/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawamoto, Kenji c/o KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 12-4, Gion 3-chome, Asaminami-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-0138 / JP | 02 /
Murakami, Yoshiaki c/o KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 12-4, Gion 3-chome, Asaminami-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-0138 / JP | 03 /
Matsumoto, Toshihisa c/o KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 12-4, Gion 3-chome, Asaminami-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-0138 / JP | [2012/10] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2012/10] | Application number, filing date | 11178456.7 | 23.08.2011 | [2012/10] | Priority number, date | JP20100197623 | 03.09.2010 Original published format: JP 2010197623 | [2012/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2426278 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/08 | [2012/10] | CPC: |
B60K15/03177 (EP,US);
E02F9/0883 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Arbeitsmaschine | [2012/10] | English: | Working machine | [2012/10] | French: | Machine de travail | [2012/10] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/41] | 14.06.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO2004067361 (CLUB CAR INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,11 * page 11, line 10 - line 18; figure 3 * [A] 5-10,12-15; | [IAY]JP2000203281 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD) [I] 1,11 * abstract * [A] 5-10,12-15 [Y] 1-4,11; | [YA]JP2004324228 (CATERPILLAR MITSUBISHI LTD) [Y] 4 * abstract * [A] 1-3,5-15; | [A]US3697093 (CADIOU SEAN) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2008279963 (HOEI IND) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]EP1921213 (KOBELCO CONSTR MACHINERY LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE102004046914 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020]; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | JPH0522342 | JP2001090112 | JP2010197623 |