11.01.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
01.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
07.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] |
31.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
24.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
10.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] |
10.04.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] |
05.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.05.2015 [2015/19] |
27.03.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] |
13.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
06.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] |
30.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
21.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] |
14.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] |
07.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
31.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
17.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] |
02.05.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] |
29.04.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
29.04.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
25.04.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
14.02.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.10.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.09.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.05.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.05.2013 |
First examination report |
|
10.05.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] |
14.12.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] |
05.12.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.05.2012 |
Publication of search report |
published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] |
04.05.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] |
04.05.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] |
07.03.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] |