Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2426376 | Global Dossier | 04.06.2014 | B1 | EP2426376 | 06.06.2012 | A3 | EP2426376 | 07.03.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102010036142 | 02.09.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102010036142 | 08.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102010036142 | 02.09.2010 |