EP2562048 - Wheel holder for a bicycle rack and a bicycle rack having a wheel holder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thule Sweden AB Box 69 330 33 Hillerstorp / SE | [2014/08] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states Thule Sweden AB Box 69 330 33 Hillerstorp / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andersson, Stefan Törnskatevägen 99 S-331 41 Värnamo / SE | 02 /
Tjäderborn, Niclas Nygatan 16b S-556 30 Jönköping / SE | [2013/09] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Göteborg / SE | [2013/09] | Application number, filing date | 11178887.3 | 25.08.2011 | [2013/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2562048 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2562048 | Date: | 19.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60R9/10 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
B60R9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/09] | Title | German: | Radhalter für einen Fahrradträger und Fahrradträger mit dem Radhalter | [2013/09] | English: | Wheel holder for a bicycle rack and a bicycle rack having a wheel holder | [2013/09] | French: | Support de roue pour porte-vélo et porte-vélo doté d'un support de roue | [2013/09] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/39] | 21.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.08.2011 | AL | 19.02.2014 | AT | 19.02.2014 | BG | 19.02.2014 | CY | 19.02.2014 | CZ | 19.02.2014 | DK | 19.02.2014 | EE | 19.02.2014 | ES | 19.02.2014 | FI | 19.02.2014 | HR | 19.02.2014 | LT | 19.02.2014 | LV | 19.02.2014 | MC | 19.02.2014 | MK | 19.02.2014 | MT | 19.02.2014 | PL | 19.02.2014 | RO | 19.02.2014 | SE | 19.02.2014 | SI | 19.02.2014 | SK | 19.02.2014 | SM | 19.02.2014 | TR | 19.02.2014 | NO | 19.05.2014 | GR | 20.05.2014 | IS | 19.06.2014 | PT | 19.06.2014 | IE | 25.08.2014 | LU | 25.08.2014 | CH | 31.08.2014 | LI | 31.08.2014 | RS | 03.09.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 25.08.2011 | |
AT | 19.02.2014 | ||
BG | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
MK | 19.02.2014 | ||
MT | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
SM | 19.02.2014 | ||
TR | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
GR | 20.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
IE | 25.08.2014 | ||
LU | 25.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 25.08.2011 | |
AT | 19.02.2014 | ||
BG | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
MT | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
SM | 19.02.2014 | ||
TR | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
GR | 20.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
IE | 25.08.2014 | ||
LU | 25.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 25.08.2011 | |
AT | 19.02.2014 | ||
BG | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
MT | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
SM | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
GR | 20.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
IE | 25.08.2014 | ||
LU | 25.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
BG | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
MT | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
SM | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
GR | 20.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
IE | 25.08.2014 | ||
LU | 25.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
MT | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
SM | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
GR | 20.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
IE | 25.08.2014 | ||
LU | 25.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
SM | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
IE | 25.08.2014 | ||
LU | 25.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
IE | 25.08.2014 | ||
LU | 25.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
LU | 25.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
LU | 25.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
LU | 25.08.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
RS | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
RS | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
RS | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
RS | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 19.02.2014 | |
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007164065 (DAVIS BRIAN F [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,9-14,16 * figures 7-9 * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0035] *; | [A]DE19934384 (ATERA EBERHARD TITTEL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3,16 * column 6, line 14 - line 36; figure 5 *; | [A]WO2009158358 (YAKIMA PRODUCTS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-3,16 * figures 2,13,14 *; | [A]WO0138141 (YAKIMA PRODUCTS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-3,16 * figures 2-7 *; | [A]US4629104 (JACQUET BERNARD A [FR]) [A] 1-3,16 * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | WO8901884 |