Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
09.04.2013 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
26.10.2012 | First examination report | |
24.10.2012 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
07.09.2012 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] |
04.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant | |
01.03.2012 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] |