EP2422685 - Rigid endoscope [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shibuya, Hiroshi c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 798, Miyanodai, Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-8538 / JP | [2012/09] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11179021.8 | 26.08.2011 | [2012/09] | Priority number, date | JP20100192746 | 30.08.2010 Original published format: JP 2010192746 | [2012/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2422685 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B1/015 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
A61B1/015 (EP,US);
A61B1/00128 (EP,US);
A61B1/00135 (EP,US);
A61B1/126 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Starres Endoskop | [2012/09] | English: | Rigid endoscope | [2012/09] | French: | Endoscope rigide | [2012/09] | Examination procedure | 28.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/41] | 25.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/35] | 10.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5971917 (KOMI SHUJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6* column 6, lines 41-52; figures 4,5,6 *; | [Y]JP2009189496 (OLYMPUS CORP) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH05269079 | JP2009189496 |